provisional gradation list of haryana education services-i
provisional gradation list of haryana education services-i provisional gradation list of haryana education services-i
PROVISIONAL GRADATION LIST OF HARYANA EDUCATION SERVICES-I AS IT STOOD ON 1 ST JUNE, 2005
- Page 2 and 3: PROVISION GRADATION LIST OF HES-1 A
- Page 4: 39. Charan Singh 18.8.1951 Jind 01.
PROVISIONAL<br />
GRADATION LIST<br />
OF<br />
HARYANA EDUCATION SERVICES-I<br />
AS IT STOOD ON<br />
1 ST JUNE, 2005
PROVISION GRADATION LIST OF HES-1 AS IT STOOD ON 1-6-2005<br />
Sr.No.<br />
Employee<br />
Name<br />
1. Nirmal<br />
Lather<br />
2. Sudha<br />
Sachdeva<br />
Date <strong>of</strong><br />
Birth<br />
Home<br />
Town<br />
Joining Date<br />
Present<br />
Place <strong>of</strong><br />
Posting<br />
24.7.1952 Sonepat 24.7.1972 Director<br />
SCERT<br />
Gurgaon<br />
Date <strong>of</strong><br />
Appointment /<br />
Promotion<br />
Mode <strong>of</strong><br />
Recruitment<br />
Remarks<br />
11.5.1991 Direct Promoted as<br />
Joint<br />
Director on<br />
2-1-2000<br />
and Addl.<br />
Director on<br />
25-12-2001<br />
18.2.1949 Narnaul 20.2.1974 17.6.1994 Promotion Under<br />
suspension<br />
3. Shish Pal<br />
Yadav<br />
4. Rajinder<br />
Singh<br />
Dahiya<br />
5. Ajit Singh<br />
Sangwan<br />
6. Siri Ram<br />
Jakhar<br />
25.2.1950 Sonepat 15.7.1987 DEO,<br />
Kurukshetra<br />
31.10.48 Rohtak 14.5.1971 DEO,<br />
Sonepat<br />
11.10.1995 Promotion<br />
31.1.1997 Promotion<br />
15.8.48 Bhiwani 30.11.73 DEO, Hisar 06.2.1997 Promotion<br />
09.3.48 Hisar 24.7.1973 DEO,<br />
Fatehabad<br />
7. Ajit Singh<br />
Rathi<br />
17.5.52 Rohtak 1.1.1980 DPEO<br />
Jhajjar<br />
8. Darshan 07.11.48 Bhiwani 17.11.1971 DPEO<br />
Dayal<br />
Faridabad<br />
Verma<br />
9. Pushkarmal 04.7.48 Narnual 10.12.1969 DEO,<br />
Verma<br />
Narnaul<br />
10. Kamal 02.3.51 Bhiwani 01.1.1980 Dy. Director,<br />
Sharma<br />
Chandigarh<br />
11. Kanta Devi 05.6.51 Sonepat 16.9.1988 Dy. Director<br />
Chandigarh<br />
12. Phoolwati 02.8.49 Gurgaon 01.1.1979 Dy. Director<br />
Gurgaon<br />
13. Sajjan 23.5.48 Rohtak 29.5.1974 Principal<br />
Kaur<br />
DIET<br />
Madina<br />
14. Phoolwati 15.4.50 Rohtak 13.7.1973 DEO,<br />
Khatri<br />
15. Shishpal<br />
Singh<br />
Chaudhry<br />
Panchkula<br />
10.12.48 Delhi 01.1.1980 DEO,<br />
Yamuna<br />
Nagar<br />
16. Hari Singh 06.6.49 Hisar 21.2.1973 DPEO,<br />
Fatehabad<br />
17. Rajinder 26.3.52 Bhiwani 12.7.1975 DPEO<br />
Pal Singh<br />
Ambala<br />
06.2.1997 Promotion<br />
31.1.1997 Promotion<br />
30.12.1997 Promotion<br />
24.1.1998 Promotion<br />
1.1.1998 Promotion<br />
29.12.1997 Promotion<br />
04.1.1998 Promotion<br />
27.12.1997 Promotion<br />
24.12.1997 Promotion<br />
14.12..1998 Promotion<br />
24.12.1997 Promotion<br />
18.12.1998 Promotion<br />
18. Satya Niwas 15.10.1953 Hisar 08.9.1978 Dy. Director<br />
Gurgaon<br />
29.10.1998 Promotion
19. Narain<br />
Singh Ruhil<br />
15.3.1949 Panipat 08.9.1971 Principal<br />
DIET,<br />
Shahpur<br />
29.10.1998 Promotion<br />
01.1.1948 Bhiwani 16.12.1972 DEO Jhajjar 08.12.1999 Promotion<br />
20. Jangjit<br />
Singh Sahu<br />
21. Sajjan Singh 02.1.1950 Bhiwani 16.12.1972 DEO,<br />
Gurgaon<br />
22. Ram 26.1.1955 Bhiwani 08.5.1986 DPEO,<br />
Purshotam<br />
Rohtak<br />
Yadav<br />
23. Ram<br />
Chander<br />
Dahiya<br />
24. Het Ram<br />
Lamba<br />
04.12.1999 Promotion<br />
Promotion<br />
05.2.1948 20.2.1973 05.2.2001 Promotion Under<br />
suspension<br />
02.1.1949 Hisar 11.7.1973 Principal<br />
DIET,<br />
Mattarshyam<br />
28.3.2001 Promotion<br />
17.5.1952 Rohtak 05.11.1975 DEO, Ambala 07.12.2001 Promotion<br />
25. Ajit Singh<br />
Dalal<br />
26. Ram Gopal 25.3.1948 Fatehabad 14.2.1973 08.12.2001 Promotion Under<br />
suspension<br />
27. Moola Ram 01.9.1949 Jhajjar 04.9.1974 DEO, 08.12.2001 Promotion<br />
Sharma<br />
Bhiwani<br />
28. Lal Chand 01.5.1948 Rewari 03.8.1970 DEO, Rewari 28.1.2002 Promotion<br />
29. Rajineder<br />
Singh<br />
02.1.1952 Rohtak 23.10.1990 DPEO<br />
Bhiwani<br />
30. Santosh 01.4.1950 Sonepat 06.8.1974 DEO, Karnal 09.4.2002 Promotion<br />
Kumari<br />
31. Rita Devi 19.4.1949 Rohtak 20.2.1973 DPEO 08.4.2002 Promotion<br />
Panchkula<br />
32. Sheela 08.3.1950 Bhiwani 16.9.1982 DPEO, Hisar 08.4.2002 Promotion<br />
Bakar<br />
33. Sneh Lata 14.7.1958 Jhajjar 01.12.1978 DEO Rohtak 08.4.2002 Promotion<br />
34. Kanta Malik 15.5.1952 Jind 02.1.1988 Principal 27.5.2002 Promotion<br />
DIET,<br />
Panchkula<br />
35. Vidyawati 24.3.1950 Sirsa 14.1.1988 DPEO,Sirsa 25.12.2002 Promotion<br />
Kamboj<br />
36. Ram Kaur 18.9.1948 Rohtak 01.12.1968 DEO, Panipat 28.7.2003 Promotion<br />
37. Santosh 11.3.1954 Hisar 28.8.1978 DEO, Sirsa 08.11.2003 Promotion<br />
Kumari<br />
38. Inder Kanta 07.12.1948 Punjab 16.11.1971 Principal,<br />
DIET, Palwal<br />
01.5.2003 Promotion
39. Charan Singh 18.8.1951 Jind 01.8.1977 DPEO, Rewari 09.12.2004 Promotion<br />
40. Sharda 02.10.1948 YNR 08.11.1971 Dy. Director 03.1.2005 Promotion<br />
Chandigarh<br />
41. Ravi Rekha 11.6.1949 Punjab 31.10.1971 DPEO, Kaithal 04.12.2004 Promotion<br />
42. Anjla Nehra 25.9.1949 U.P. 08.5.1973 DPEO, 08.12.2004 Promotion<br />
Gurgaon<br />
43. Savitri 06.5.1948 Hisar 07.6.1974 DPEO 29.4.2005 Promotion<br />
,Kurukshetra<br />
44. Kiran Mayee 05.7.1966 Sonepat 05.10.1989 Dy. Director 16.12.2004 Direct<br />
Chandigarh<br />
45. Bhagat Ram 06.7.1956 Fatehabad 14.1.1983 DEO,Kaithal 18.12.2004 Direct<br />
46. Jile Singh 06.4.1969 Kaithal 03.4.1987 DPEO,<br />
Yamuna Nagar<br />
47. Dilbag Singh 01.2.1965 Rohtak 23.6.1999 DPEO,<br />
Sonepat<br />
48. Daya Nand 21.3.1956 M/G 13.1.1983 DPEO,<br />
Narnaul<br />
49. Rajender 26.6.1961 Bhiwani 13.1.1983 Principal<br />
Parshad<br />
DIET, Rewari<br />
50. Sushil Batra 22.5.1958 Jhajjar 31.10.1984 Principal<br />
DIET,<br />
Gurgaon<br />
51. Mool Chand 13.11.1958 Narnaul 01.8.1985 Principal<br />
DIET,<br />
Biswanmeel<br />
52. Harcharan 05.4.1962 Fatehabad 30.9.1988 Principal<br />
Singh<br />
DIET, Ding<br />
53. Jaiveer 01.4.1960 Hisar Principal DIET<br />
Dhanda<br />
, IKKAS<br />
Direct<br />
23.6.1999 Direct<br />
13.9.2000 Direct<br />
16.12.2004 Direct<br />
20.12.2004 Direct<br />
16.12.2004 Direct<br />
20.12.2004 Direct<br />
Direct