Government of India Central Electricity Authority Sewa Bhawan, R.K. ...
Government of India Central Electricity Authority Sewa Bhawan, R.K. ... Government of India Central Electricity Authority Sewa Bhawan, R.K. ...
S.No. Name & Qualifictions Date of Birth WhetherPermanent/QuasipermanentDt.of commencementof service/ Date ofappt.to Group B/Group A Junior/Group A Senior (Adhoc)Dt. Of regularApptt.to theGradeWhetherDirectRecruit orPromoteeRemarks119 Purnima Sharma 21/08/1959 Temp. 29/11/1983 29/11/1983 UPSCB.Sc. Engg. In -Power System 29/11/1983Resigned on7.6.1993.120 Partha P. Bandhopadhyay 29/12/1957 Pmt. AD 16/06/1983 16/06/1983 UPSCB.E. Elec. Engg. 01/04/1988 -16/06/1983121 Brahmeshwar Tewary 28/12/1956 -do- 27/10/1984 27/10/1984 UPSCB.Sc. Engg. -27/10/1984122 Ashok Kumar Mishra 20/07/1956 -do- 30/05/1984 30/05/1984 UPSCB.E. Elec. -30/05/1984123 Rajesh Kumar Sethi 30/06/1958 -do- 15/03/1983 15/03/1983 UPSCB.Sc. Elec. Engg. -15/03/1983124 Pankaj Batra 04/09/1958 -do- 30/04/1983 30/04/1983 UPSCB.Tech. -30/04/1983125 Prithwish Mukhopadhyay 06/08/1958 -do- 07/05/1983 07/05/1983 UPSCB.E. Elec.Engg. -07/05/1983Page 21 of 60
S.No. Name & Qualifictions Date of Birth WhetherPermanent/QuasipermanentDt.of commencementof service/ Date ofappt.to Group B/Group A Junior/Group A Senior (Adhoc)Dt. Of regularApptt.to theGradeWhetherDirectRecruit orPromoteeRemarks126 Gyanendra Singh 17/08/1960 Temp. 24/01/1983 24/01/1983 UPSC TerminatedB.E. Elec. Engg. - wef 31.3.198824/01/1983 (AN)127 Radhey Shayam Saha 15/12/1954 Pmt. AD 15/11/1983 15/11/1983 UPSCB.Sc. (Hons.) 01/04/1988 -B.E.(Elect.). 15/11/1983128 Navneet Varma 03/05/1960 Pmt. AD 21/10/1983 21/10/1983 UPSCB.Tech. 01/04/1988 -21/10/1983Resigned on14.8.1986.129 Abdul Aziz Khatana 03/05/1955 -do- 01/06/1984 01/06/1984 UPSCB.E. Elec. Engg. -01/06/1984130 G. Anbunesan (SC) 04/07/1958 -do- 09/05/1983 09/05/1983 UPSCB.E. Elec. Engg. -09/05/1983131 Moti Lal (SC) 02/12/1955 -do- 19/02/1983 19/02/1983 UPSCB.Tech. -19/02/1983132 Mangal Singh (SC) 04/07/1953 -do- 24/12/1983 24/12/1983 UPSCB.Tech. -24/12/1983133 Ashok Kumar Bhargava 07/11/1958 Temp. 27/01/1986 27/01/1986 UPSCResigned inJune 1986.Page 22 of 60
- Page 1 and 2: Government of IndiaCentral Electric
- Page 3 and 4: S.No. Name & Qualifictions Date of
- Page 5 and 6: S.No. Name & Qualifictions Date of
- Page 7 and 8: S.No. Name & Qualifictions Date of
- Page 9 and 10: S.No. Name & Qualifictions Date of
- Page 11 and 12: S.No. Name & Qualifictions Date of
- Page 13 and 14: S.No. Name & Qualifictions Date of
- Page 15 and 16: S.No. Name & Qualifictions Date of
- Page 17 and 18: S.No. Name & Qualifictions Date of
- Page 19 and 20: S.No. Name & Qualifictions Date of
- Page 21: S.No. Name & Qualifictions Date of
- Page 25 and 26: S.No. Name & Qualifictions Date of
- Page 27 and 28: S.No. Name & Qualifictions Date of
- Page 29 and 30: S.No. Name & Qualifictions Date of
- Page 31 and 32: S.No. Name & Qualifictions Date of
- Page 33 and 34: S.No. Name & Qualifictions Date of
- Page 35 and 36: S.No. Name & Qualifictions Date of
- Page 37 and 38: S.No. Name & Qualifictions Date of
- Page 39 and 40: S.No. Name & Qualifictions Date of
- Page 41 and 42: S.No. Name & Qualifictions Date of
- Page 43 and 44: S.No. Name & Qualifictions Date of
- Page 45 and 46: S.No. Name & Qualifictions Date of
- Page 47 and 48: S.No. Name & Qualifictions Date of
- Page 49 and 50: S.No. Name & Qualifictions Date of
- Page 51 and 52: S.No. Name & Qualifictions Date of
- Page 53 and 54: S.No. Name & Qualifictions Date of
- Page 55 and 56: S.No. Name & Qualifictions Date of
- Page 57 and 58: S.No. Name & Qualifictions Date of
- Page 59 and 60: S.No. Name & Qualifictions Date of
- Page 61: S.No. Name & Qualifictions Date of
S.No. Name & Qualifictions Date <strong>of</strong> Birth WhetherPermanent/QuasipermanentDt.<strong>of</strong> commencement<strong>of</strong> service/ Date <strong>of</strong>appt.to Group B/Group A Junior/Group A Senior (Adhoc)Dt. Of regularApptt.to theGradeWhetherDirectRecruit orPromoteeRemarks126 Gyanendra Singh 17/08/1960 Temp. 24/01/1983 24/01/1983 UPSC TerminatedB.E. Elec. Engg. - wef 31.3.198824/01/1983 (AN)127 Radhey Shayam Saha 15/12/1954 Pmt. AD 15/11/1983 15/11/1983 UPSCB.Sc. (Hons.) 01/04/1988 -B.E.(Elect.). 15/11/1983128 Navneet Varma 03/05/1960 Pmt. AD 21/10/1983 21/10/1983 UPSCB.Tech. 01/04/1988 -21/10/1983Resigned on14.8.1986.129 Abdul Aziz Khatana 03/05/1955 -do- 01/06/1984 01/06/1984 UPSCB.E. Elec. Engg. -01/06/1984130 G. Anbunesan (SC) 04/07/1958 -do- 09/05/1983 09/05/1983 UPSCB.E. Elec. Engg. -09/05/1983131 Moti Lal (SC) 02/12/1955 -do- 19/02/1983 19/02/1983 UPSCB.Tech. -19/02/1983132 Mangal Singh (SC) 04/07/1953 -do- 24/12/1983 24/12/1983 UPSCB.Tech. -24/12/1983133 Ashok Kumar Bhargava 07/11/1958 Temp. 27/01/1986 27/01/1986 UPSCResigned inJune 1986.Page 22 <strong>of</strong> 60