Government of India Central Electricity Authority Sewa Bhawan, R.K. ...
Government of India Central Electricity Authority Sewa Bhawan, R.K. ... Government of India Central Electricity Authority Sewa Bhawan, R.K. ...
S.No. Name & Qualifictions Date of Birth WhetherPermanent/QuasipermanentDt.of commencementof service/ Date ofappt.to Group B/Group A Junior/Group A Senior (Adhoc)Dt. Of regularApptt.to theGradeWhetherDirectRecruit orPromoteeRemarks71 Ajay Kumar Jain 26/06/1955 Pmt. AD 31/12/1980 31/12/1980 UPSCB.E. Elec. 01/04/1988 -31/12/198014/03/199072 Jogendra Singh 01/07/1945 Pmt. EAD 24-1-69(AN) 02/04/1980 DPCB.Sc. Elec. Engg. 28/09/1982 09/04/197302/04/198031/05/199373 Girish Kumar Gupta 15/04/1959 Q.P. AD 02/12/1980 02/12/1980 UPSCB.E. Elec. 02/12/1983 -02/12/1980Resigned15.7.198674 K.K. Arya 28/04/1958 Pmt. AD 02/12/1980 02/12/1980 UPSCB.SC. Elec. Engg. 01/04/1988 -M. Tech. in Power 02/12/1980Apparatus & System 14/03/199075 V.S. Karra 24/02/1945 Pmt. EAD 07/03/1969 02/04/1980 DPCB.E. Elec. 28/09/1982 09/04/197302/04/198014/03/199076 Gajindera Behari 24/07/1956 Pmt. AD 28/11/1980 28/11/1980 UPSCB.Sc. (Hons.) 01/04/1988 -B.E. Elec. 28/11/198014/03/1990Page 13 of 60
S.No. Name & Qualifictions Date of Birth WhetherPermanent/QuasipermanentDt.of commencementof service/ Date ofappt.to Group B/Group A Junior/Group A Senior (Adhoc)Dt. Of regularApptt.to theGradeWhetherDirectRecruit orPromoteeRemarks77 R. Rajagopalacharyulu 01/09/1946 -do- 19/04/1969 02/04/1980 DPCB.E. Elec. 09/04/197302/04/198078 P. Pantayya 06/02/1954 Pmt. AD 29/12/1980 29/12/1980 UPSCB.E. Elec. 01/04/1988 -29/12/198079 Atul Sehgal 04/09/1956 -do- 01/12/1980 01/12/1980 UPSCB.SC. Elec.Engg. -01/12/198014/03/199080 Ajay Kumar Saxena 29/02/1956 -do- 09/02/1981 09/02/1981 UPSCME (Electrical) -Measurement & 09/02/1981Instrumentation. 14/03/199081 B.M. Sethi 05/05/1946 Pmt. EAD 08/08/1969 02/04/1980 DPCB.E. Elec. 28/09/1982 09/04/197302/04/198014/03/199082 R.K. Bhatt 25/11/1948 Pmt. AD 09/08/1973 28/11/1980 UPSCB.Sc. Elec. Engg. 01/04/1988 05/11/197528/11/198021/06/1993Page 14 of 60
- Page 1 and 2: Government of IndiaCentral Electric
- Page 3 and 4: S.No. Name & Qualifictions Date of
- Page 5 and 6: S.No. Name & Qualifictions Date of
- Page 7 and 8: S.No. Name & Qualifictions Date of
- Page 9 and 10: S.No. Name & Qualifictions Date of
- Page 11 and 12: S.No. Name & Qualifictions Date of
- Page 13: S.No. Name & Qualifictions Date of
- Page 17 and 18: S.No. Name & Qualifictions Date of
- Page 19 and 20: S.No. Name & Qualifictions Date of
- Page 21 and 22: S.No. Name & Qualifictions Date of
- Page 23 and 24: S.No. Name & Qualifictions Date of
- Page 25 and 26: S.No. Name & Qualifictions Date of
- Page 27 and 28: S.No. Name & Qualifictions Date of
- Page 29 and 30: S.No. Name & Qualifictions Date of
- Page 31 and 32: S.No. Name & Qualifictions Date of
- Page 33 and 34: S.No. Name & Qualifictions Date of
- Page 35 and 36: S.No. Name & Qualifictions Date of
- Page 37 and 38: S.No. Name & Qualifictions Date of
- Page 39 and 40: S.No. Name & Qualifictions Date of
- Page 41 and 42: S.No. Name & Qualifictions Date of
- Page 43 and 44: S.No. Name & Qualifictions Date of
- Page 45 and 46: S.No. Name & Qualifictions Date of
- Page 47 and 48: S.No. Name & Qualifictions Date of
- Page 49 and 50: S.No. Name & Qualifictions Date of
- Page 51 and 52: S.No. Name & Qualifictions Date of
- Page 53 and 54: S.No. Name & Qualifictions Date of
- Page 55 and 56: S.No. Name & Qualifictions Date of
- Page 57 and 58: S.No. Name & Qualifictions Date of
- Page 59 and 60: S.No. Name & Qualifictions Date of
- Page 61: S.No. Name & Qualifictions Date of
S.No. Name & Qualifictions Date <strong>of</strong> Birth WhetherPermanent/QuasipermanentDt.<strong>of</strong> commencement<strong>of</strong> service/ Date <strong>of</strong>appt.to Group B/Group A Junior/Group A Senior (Adhoc)Dt. Of regularApptt.to theGradeWhetherDirectRecruit orPromoteeRemarks77 R. Rajagopalacharyulu 01/09/1946 -do- 19/04/1969 02/04/1980 DPCB.E. Elec. 09/04/197302/04/198078 P. Pantayya 06/02/1954 Pmt. AD 29/12/1980 29/12/1980 UPSCB.E. Elec. 01/04/1988 -29/12/198079 Atul Sehgal 04/09/1956 -do- 01/12/1980 01/12/1980 UPSCB.SC. Elec.Engg. -01/12/198014/03/199080 Ajay Kumar Saxena 29/02/1956 -do- 09/02/1981 09/02/1981 UPSCME (Electrical) -Measurement & 09/02/1981Instrumentation. 14/03/199081 B.M. Sethi 05/05/1946 Pmt. EAD 08/08/1969 02/04/1980 DPCB.E. Elec. 28/09/1982 09/04/197302/04/198014/03/199082 R.K. Bhatt 25/11/1948 Pmt. AD 09/08/1973 28/11/1980 UPSCB.Sc. Elec. Engg. 01/04/1988 05/11/197528/11/198021/06/1993Page 14 <strong>of</strong> 60