Historical records of the 91st Argyllshire ... - waughfamily.ca
Historical records of the 91st Argyllshire ... - waughfamily.ca Historical records of the 91st Argyllshire ... - waughfamily.ca
SERVICES OF OFFICERS.COMPILED FROM ANNUAL ARMY LISTS AND OTHERAUTHENTIC SOURCES.[NOTE. The year given in brackets at the close of the record of anofficer's service, refers to the date of the last annual Army List inwhich his name appears.]Aitcheson, William. Ensign, 21st March, 1845. Served withthe regiment in the Kaffir War of 1846;had his horse shot under him,21st May, 1846, while proceeding from Grahamstown to Fort Peddie(medal). To 3rd Guards (Scots Guards), 2nd October, 1846.Alison, Charles German. Ensign, 18th December, 1863 ;lieutenant,9th March, 1867. Served in India with the regiment.Captain, 29th January, 1870. Retired, 23rd July, 1875.Allen, John Michael. Ensign, 2nd October, 1855 ; lieutenant,23rd March, 1858. Served in the Ionian Islands with the regiment.Died, 1st July, 1859.Anderson, Robert, P. W. and K. H. From 14th battalion ofreserve. Lieutenant, 12th October, 1804 ; captain, 30th April, 1812 ;major, 23rd September, 1824 ; lieutenant-colonel, 2nd December,1831. Served in the expedition to Hanover, 1805-1806. In battlesof Roleia, Vimiero, and Corunna ;in the expedition to Walcheren,1809; to Swedish Pomerauia, 1813; Holland in 1814, including theattack of Bergen-op-Zoom. Was present at Waterloo, storming ofof Paris. Commanded the 91st from 2ndCambray, and captureDecember, 1837, to 1st July, 1841. Retired, 1841..Anderson, Ensign, 13th August, 1805 ; lieutenant, 25thAugust, 1807. Died, 1814.Anderson, Matthew. Ensign, llth May, 1808; lieutenant,12th October, 1809. To 52nd Foot, 19th July, 1810, with which heserved at Waterloo (wounded). Retired, 1821.Anderson, Robert. Ensign, llth August, 1808 (1810).Anderson, William. Ensign, 27th August, 1829; lieutenant,
320 SERVICES OF OFFICERS OF THE14th September, 1832. To llth Light Dragoons, 4th October, 1833.Retired, 1838.Antrobus, Philip. From 9th Light Dragoons. Lieutenant,2nd February, 1844. To 2nd Dragoons as paymaster, 1st January,1849. Retired, 1854.Arbuthnot, Honourable Francis. Ensign, 29th August,1801 ; lieutenant, 1802. To 9th Foot, 10th February, 1803.Arbuthnot, Charles George James. Served in the llthLight Dragoons. Colonel of the 91st, 4th July, 1864, to 26th August,1870.Arden, WUliam. Surgeon, 1851. To Military Train, 1856.Armstrong, Daniel. Surgeon, 1850 to 1851.Armstrong, Elliot. Ensign, 8th June, 1855 ; lieutenant, llthDecember, 1857. Served in Greece, Ionian Islands, and India withthe regiment. Retired, 19th July, 1864.Arthur, George. Ensign, 26th August, 1804. To 35th Foot,24th June, 1805.Ayton, Robinson. Surgeon, 1821 to 1827.Baillie, William Hunter. Ensign, llth December, 1857;lieutenant, 2nd July, 1859. Served with the regiment in the IonianIslands and India. To 8th Foot, 30th November, 1860.Bankes, Thomas Holme. Ensign, 8th June, 1867 ; lieutenant,28th May, 1870. Retired, 1st September, 1875.Barfoot, William. Quarter-master, 1836. Retired, 1841.Barker, William Henry. Ensign, 9th July, 1813 ; lieutenant,8th January, 1818. To half-pay, 1st July, 1819.Barnes, George Adam. Ensign, 12th December, 1822; lieutenant,23rd September, 1824. Joined the St. Helena Regiment, 6thNovember, 1835, on the staff as town-major. Captain, 30th October,1840 (1842).Barney, John Edward. From 58th Foot. Lieutenant, 29thSeptember, 1825 ; captain, 7th January, 1842. Served through theKaffir War of 1846-47. Retired, 8th January, 1847.Barrington, Henry. From 87th Foot. Major, 1st April, 1819.To half-pay, 100th Foot, 4th October, 1822.Barton, Henry Charles Benyon. Ensign, 12th July, 1839.Retired, 1842.Battiscombe, William Benjamin. Ensign, 15th March,1850; lieutenant, 21st May, 1852; captain, 10th November, 1854.Served in Malta, Greece, Ionian Islands, and India with the regiment.Major, 12th November, 1860. To half-pay, 27th July, 1869.Baumgardt, John. Ensign, 1st August, 1798 ; lieutenant, 20thMarch, 1801. To 8th Light Dragoons, 9th September, 1801.Bayley, Frederick. Ensign, 30th October, 1838; lieutenant,
- Page 310 and 311: 9 1ST ARGYLLSHIRE HIGHLANDERS. 271n
- Page 313 and 314: i/ne of marchshown t/ius lonclan| B
- Page 315: 274 HISTORICAL RECORDS OP THE1879.
- Page 318 and 319: 9 1ST ARGYLLSHIRE HIGHLANDERS. 275w
- Page 322 and 323: 9 1ST ARGYLLSHIRE HIGHLANDERS. 277w
- Page 324 and 325: 91ST ARGYLLSHIRE HIGHLANDERS. 279be
- Page 326 and 327: 9 1ST ARGYLLSHIRE HIGHLANDERS. 281o
- Page 328 and 329: 9 1ST ARGYLLSHIRE HIGHLANDERS. 283E
- Page 330 and 331: 9 1ST ARGYLLSHIRE HIGHLANDERS. 285t
- Page 332 and 333: 9 1ST AKGYLLSHIEE HIGHLANDEES. 287C
- Page 335 and 336: LUCJ
- Page 337: 290 HISTORICAL RECORDS OP THE1879.
- Page 341 and 342: \292 HISTORICAL RECORDS v. IP'1879.
- Page 343 and 344: 294 HISTORICAL EECORDS OP THE1879.
- Page 345 and 346: 296 HISTORICAL RECORDS OP THE1881.
- Page 347 and 348: 298 HISTORICAL EECORDS OF THE 9 1ST
- Page 349 and 350: 300 APPENDICES.After his death they
- Page 351 and 352: 308 APPENDICES.D.SUCCESSION LISTOF
- Page 353 and 354: 310 APPENDICES.Fort Peddle, May 27
- Page 355 and 356: 312 APPENDICES.G.THE WATERLOO ROLL.
- Page 357 and 358: 314 APPENDICES.H.REGIMENTAL RECORD
- Page 359 and 360: 316 APPENDICES.in are inscribed on
- Page 364 and 365: 9 1ST ARGYLLSHIRE HIGHLANDERS. 3212
- Page 366 and 367: 9 1ST ARGYLLSHIRE HIGHLANDERS. 323b
- Page 368 and 369: 9 1ST ARGYLLSHIRE HIGHLANDERS. 325C
- Page 370 and 371: 9 1ST ARGYLLSHIRE HIGHLANDERS. 327C
- Page 372 and 373: 9 1ST ARGYLLSHIRE HIGHLANDERS. 329C
- Page 374 and 375: 9 1ST ARGYLLSHIRE HIGHLANDERS. 331t
- Page 376 and 377: 9 1ST ARGYLLSHIRE HIGHLANDERS. 333F
- Page 378 and 379: 9 1ST ARGYLLSHIRE HIGHLANDERS. 335G
- Page 380 and 381: 9 1ST ARGYLLSHIRE HIGHLANDERS. 337o
- Page 382 and 383: 9 1ST ARGYLLSHIRE HIGHLANDERS. 339C
- Page 384 and 385: 9 1ST ARGYLLSHIRE HIGHLANDERS. 341L
- Page 386 and 387: 9 1ST ARGYLLSHIRE HIGHLANDERS. 343M
- Page 388 and 389: 9 1ST ARGYLLSHIRE HIGHLANDERS. 345t
- Page 390 and 391: 9 1ST AEGYLLSHIEE HIGHLANDEES. 347M
- Page 392 and 393: 9 1ST ARGYLLSHIRE HIGHLANDERS. 349O
- Page 394 and 395: 9 1ST ARGYLLSHIRE HIGHLANDERS. 351t
- Page 396 and 397: 9 1ST AEGYLLSHIRE HIGHLANDERS. 353R
- Page 398 and 399: 9 1ST ARGYLLSHIRE HIGHLANDERS. 355P
- Page 400 and 401: 9 1ST ARGYLLSHIRE HIGHLANDERS. 357S
- Page 402 and 403: 9 1ST ARGYLLSHIRE HIGHLANDERS. 3591
- Page 404: 9 1ST ARGYLLSHIRE HIGHLANDERS. 361S
320 SERVICES OF OFFICERS OF THE14th September, 1832. To llth Light Dragoons, 4th October, 1833.Retired, 1838.Antrobus, Philip. From 9th Light Dragoons. Lieutenant,2nd February, 1844. To 2nd Dragoons as paymaster, 1st January,1849. Retired, 1854.Arbuthnot, Honourable Francis. Ensign, 29th August,1801 ; lieutenant, 1802. To 9th Foot, 10th February, 1803.Arbuthnot, Charles George James. Served in <strong>the</strong> llthLight Dragoons. Colonel <strong>of</strong> <strong>the</strong> <strong>91st</strong>, 4th July, 1864, to 26th August,1870.Arden, WUliam. Surgeon, 1851. To Military Train, 1856.Armstrong, Daniel. Surgeon, 1850 to 1851.Armstrong, Elliot. Ensign, 8th June, 1855 ; lieutenant, llthDecember, 1857. Served in Greece, Ionian Islands, and India with<strong>the</strong> regiment. Retired, 19th July, 1864.Arthur, George. Ensign, 26th August, 1804. To 35th Foot,24th June, 1805.Ayton, Robinson. Surgeon, 1821 to 1827.Baillie, William Hunter. Ensign, llth December, 1857;lieutenant, 2nd July, 1859. Served with <strong>the</strong> regiment in <strong>the</strong> IonianIslands and India. To 8th Foot, 30th November, 1860.Bankes, Thomas Holme. Ensign, 8th June, 1867 ; lieutenant,28th May, 1870. Retired, 1st September, 1875.Barfoot, William. Quarter-master, 1836. Retired, 1841.Barker, William Henry. Ensign, 9th July, 1813 ; lieutenant,8th January, 1818. To half-pay, 1st July, 1819.Barnes, George Adam. Ensign, 12th December, 1822; lieutenant,23rd September, 1824. Joined <strong>the</strong> St. Helena Regiment, 6thNovember, 1835, on <strong>the</strong> staff as town-major. Captain, 30th October,1840 (1842).Barney, John Edward. From 58th Foot. Lieutenant, 29thSeptember, 1825 ; <strong>ca</strong>ptain, 7th January, 1842. Served through <strong>the</strong>Kaffir War <strong>of</strong> 1846-47. Retired, 8th January, 1847.Barrington, Henry. From 87th Foot. Major, 1st April, 1819.To half-pay, 100th Foot, 4th October, 1822.Barton, Henry Charles Benyon. Ensign, 12th July, 1839.Retired, 1842.Battiscombe, William Benjamin. Ensign, 15th March,1850; lieutenant, 21st May, 1852; <strong>ca</strong>ptain, 10th November, 1854.Served in Malta, Greece, Ionian Islands, and India with <strong>the</strong> regiment.Major, 12th November, 1860. To half-pay, 27th July, 1869.Baumgardt, John. Ensign, 1st August, 1798 ; lieutenant, 20thMarch, 1801. To 8th Light Dragoons, 9th September, 1801.Bayley, Frederick. Ensign, 30th October, 1838; lieutenant,