Georgia Official and Statistical Register 1983-84 - the Digital Library ...
Georgia Official and Statistical Register 1983-84 - the Digital Library ... Georgia Official and Statistical Register 1983-84 - the Digital Library ...
Forty-Ninth District — Forsyih (Pi.). Hall Fifty-Fourth District — Catoosa(Pt.). Murray. Whiifield (Pt.)J. Nathan Deal. Gainesville. Attorney. Born Aug. 25,1942 in JenkinsCo., Ga. Graduated Mercer U.,AB. 1964; LLB, 1966. Baptist.Democrat. JAGC. Senator, 1981-84. Wife, former Emilie SandraDunagan, 4 children.W.W. Fincher, Jr., Chatsworth.Pharmacist & Theatre Owner. BornMay 16. 1914 in Cherokee Co.,Ga. Attended S.C.U. PharmacySchool. 1931-33. Methodist. Democrat. Mason, Elk, Shriner, LionsClub. Senator. 1965-84. Wife,former Eunice P. Loughridge; 3children.Fiftieth District Dawson. Habersham, Lumpkin, Rabun.Stephens. Towns. Union, WhiteJohn C. Foster, Sr., Cornelia. Businessman. Born April 2, 1935 inHabersham Co., Ga. PiedmontCollege, BS. 1969. Baptist. Democrat. C. of C., Rotarian. US Army,1954-55. Senator, 1975-84. Wife,former Bobbie Helen Carpenter; 2children.Fifty-Fifth Dktrkt DeKalb (Pt.)Lawrence (Bud) Stumbaugh. StoneMountain. President, TemporaryHelp Service. Born Aug. 24, 1940in Escambia Co., Fla. David LipscombCollege, BS. Church ofChrist. Democrat, Senator, 1975-84. Wife, former Carole LeoneHollingsworth; 2 children.Fifty-First District — Cherokee (Pi.). Fannin. Gilmer. Gordon,Pickens. Whitfield (Pi.)Max R. Brannon, Calhoun. Funeral Director. Born Dec. 22, 1933in Gordon Co., Ga. GraduatedCalhoun High School Veterans,1959. Baptist. Democrat. Mason;Shriner. US Army. 1952-55. Judge,Court of Probate, 1966-69. Coroner, Gordon Co., 1976-78. Senator, 1981-84. Wife, former GentleLee Pettett; 3 children.Fifty-Second District — Barlow (Pt.). FloydEdward Hine, Jr., Rome. Attorney. Born Dec. 26, 1952 in FloydCo., Ga. Graduated Emory U.,BA. 1973; JD, 1976. Episcopalian.Democrat. Senator, 1983-84. Wife,former Casey Anne Nikoloric; Ison.Fifty-Third Dirtrirt — Caloosa(Pi.). Chattooga. Dade, WalkerWaymond C. Muggins, LaFayette.Retired, Forest Ranger. Born Sept.3,1927 in Walker Co., Ga. Graduated West Armuchee High School.Baptist. Democrat. Optimist Club;C. of C. Senator, 1983-84. Wife,former Annette Martin; 1 son.Fifty-Sixth Dktrict — Cobb (Pt.), Forsyth (Pt.), Fulton (Pt.)Haskew H. Brantley, Jr., Atlanta.Pres., Industrial Vulcanizing Co.Born Sept. 28, 1922 in JeffersonCo., Ala. Ga. Tech., BS, 1948.Episcopalian. Republican. SigmaAlpha Epsilon. Civitan Club.USN-WW II; Korea. Mbr., Houseof Rep., 1967-74. Senator, 1975-84. Wife, former Miriam Laughlin;4 children.SENATE STANDING COMMITTEES1983-84 TERMAgricultureMcGill of 24th, ChairmanEnglish of 21st, Vice ChairmanTrulock of I Oth, SecretaryKennedy of 4thAppropriationsStarr of 44th, ChairmanHolloway of 12th, Vice ChairmanAllgood of 22nd, SecretaryBarnes of 33rdBowen of 13thBroun of 46thBryant of 3rdColeman of 1stCoverdell of 40thDean of 31stEnglish of 21 stEngram of 34thFincher of 54thGarner of 30thTimmons of llthTurner of 8thWalker of 19thGillisof20thHill of 29thHorton of 17thHoward of 42ndHudgins of 15thKennedy of 4thLester of 23rdMcGill of 24thScott (Tom) of 43rdStumbaugh of 55thTate of 38thThompson of 32ndTurner of 8th85
Continuation SubcommitteeStarr of 44th, Chairman Gillis of 20thAllgood of 22nd H olloway of 12thBroun of 46th Kennedy of 4thBryant of 3rd Stumbaugh of 55thBanking and FinanceLester of 23rd, ChairmanColeman of I st. Vice ChairmanDawkins of 45th, SecretaryBrantley of 56thBroun of 46thCoverdellof40thGillis of 20thH olloway of 12thHudginsof 15thMcKenzie of 14thPerry of 7thPhillips of 9thScott (Tom) of 43rdStarr of 44thThompson of 32ndTurner of 8thBanking SubcommitteeCoverdell of 40th, Chairman Phillips of 9thBrantley of 56th Scott (Tom) of 43rdDawkins of 45th Starr of 44thH olloway of 12thWays and Means SubcommitteeMcKenzie of 14th, Chairman Hudgins of 15thBroun of 46th Perry of 7thColeman of 1st Thompson of 32ndGillis of 20th Turner of 8thChildren and YouthHudgins of 15th, ChairmanReddish of 6th, Vice ChairmanBurton of 5th, SecretaryBond of 39thConsumer AffairsBond of 39th, ChairmanCoggin of 35th, Vice ChairmanBarker of 18th, SecretaryThompson of 32nd, ChairmanPerry of 7th, Vice ChairmanPhillips of 9th, SecretaryDefense and Veterans AffairsBrannon of 51 stTate of 38thThompson of 32ndBrantley of 56thScott (David) of 36thBrannon of 51stMine of 52ndEconomic Development and TourismBroun of 46th, ChairmanTrulock of 10th, Vice ChairmanEngram of 34th, SecretaryCoverdell of 40thFoster of 50thGillis of 20thHarris of 27thHorton of 17thScott (David) of 36thTysinger of 41stSmall Business SubcommitteeTysinger of 41 st. Chairman Harris of 27thCoverdell of 40th Scott (David) of 36thTourism SubcommitteeFoster of 50th, Chairman Gillis of 20thEngram of 34th Trulock of 10thEducationFoster of 50th, ChairmanEngram of 34th, Vice ChairmanBurton of 5th, SecretaryDawkins of 45thDeal of 49thDean of 31stHarrison of 37thHuggins of 53rdLand of 16thPhillips of 9thStarr of 44thTateof38thLibraries SubcommitteeBurton of 5th, Chairman Dean of 31 stDeal of 49th Phillips of 9thPrimary and Secondary SubcommitteeTate of 38th, Chairman Engram of 34thDawkins of 45thVocational and Technical SubcommitteeHarrison of 37th, Chairman Starr of 44thLand of 16thFederal, State and Community AffairsScott (Tom) of 43rd, ChairmanMcKenzie of 14th, Vice ChairmanHarris of 27th, SecretaryBurton of 5thCobbof28thPeevyof48thPhillips of 9thScott (Al) of 2ndScott (David) of 36thLocal Affairs SubcommitteeMcKenzie of 14th, Chairman Harris of 27thCobb of 28th Scott (Al) of 2ndGovernmental OperationsKidd of 25th, ChairmanBrannon of 51st, Vice ChairmanReddish of 6th, SecretaryBarker of 18thBond of 39thCoggin of 35thColeman of 1stGarner of 30thHill of 29thHorton of 17thStumbaugh of 55thGovernmental Organization SubcommitteeCoggin of 35th, Chairman Littlefield of 6thColeman of 1 st Stumbaugh of 55thHorton of 17thMerit System SubcommitteeBarker of 18th, Chairman Garner of 30thBond of 39th Hill of 29thBrannon of 51stHigher EducationFincher of 54th, Chairman Broun of 46thScott (David) of 36th, Vice Chairman English of 21 stTysinger of 41 st, Secretary Hine of 52ndAllgood of 22ndScience and Technology SubcommitteeTysinger of 41st, Chairman Scott (David) of 36thBroun of 46th86
- Page 40 and 41: date of assuming office. No person
- Page 42 and 43: pile an annual report for the Gener
- Page 44 and 45: Marketing Jimmy C. Bridges. Assista
- Page 46 and 47: Chapter IIISTATE AGENCIESDEPARTMENT
- Page 48 and 49: DEPARTMENT OF COMMUNITY AFFAIRSThe
- Page 50 and 51: The Commission appoints, by and wit
- Page 52 and 53: James G. Ledbetter, Atlanta. Commis
- Page 54 and 55: pletely revised and consolidated la
- Page 56 and 57: ules and regulations of the Board o
- Page 58 and 59: The chief administrative officer of
- Page 60 and 61: The Student Incentive Grant Program
- Page 62 and 63: Lewis Canup .............. District
- Page 64 and 65: The Veterans Service Board consists
- Page 66 and 67: Chapter IVASSOCIATIONS, AUTHORITIES
- Page 68 and 69: Organized Crime Prevention CouncilT
- Page 70 and 71: Doris I. WillmerPaul R. BurksEnviro
- Page 72 and 73: Mental Health & Mental Retardation,
- Page 74 and 75: Berta F. AdamsEleanor GranumJanet G
- Page 76 and 77: Fifth Congressional District, Georg
- Page 78 and 79: HISTORY OF CONGRESSIONAL DISTRICTSA
- Page 80 and 81: 9. Banks, Cherokee, Dawson, Fannin,
- Page 82 and 83: U.S. REPRESENTATIVES IN CONGRESSFRO
- Page 84 and 85: THE STATE SENATETERM1983-84OFFICERS
- Page 86 and 87: Ninth District Gwinnett (Pt.)Robert
- Page 88 and 89: Twenty-Ninth District Carroll (Pi.)
- Page 92 and 93: University System SubcommitteeEngli
- Page 94 and 95: THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVESTERM198
- Page 96 and 97: District 5 Chattooga, Dade (Pt.). W
- Page 98 and 99: District 18 Haralson. Paulding. Pol
- Page 100 and 101: District 30 Fulton (Pt.) District 3
- Page 102 and 103: District 50 — DeKalb (Pt.) Distri
- Page 104 and 105: District 68 Clarke (Pt.) District 7
- Page 106 and 107: District 84 Columbia (Pt.), McDuffi
- Page 108 and 109: District 104 Jones (Pt.), Twiggs, W
- Page 110 and 111: District 124 Chatham (Pt.) District
- Page 112 and 113: istrict!44 Colquitt (Pt.), Mitchell
- Page 114 and 115: Wood, ChairmanGaler, Vice ChairmanP
- Page 116 and 117: Bray, ChairmanHolmes, Vice Chairman
- Page 118 and 119: Chapter VIIIJUDICIARY SYSTEM OF GEO
- Page 120 and 121: Braswell D. Deen, Jr., Alma &Atlant
- Page 122 and 123: JoelJames Fryer, Atlanta. Born Dec.
- Page 124 and 125: Cobb Circuit CobbJames LaRue Dullar
- Page 126 and 127: Charles C. Pittard, Duluth. Judge.
- Page 128 and 129: Pataula CircuitClay, Early. Miller,
- Page 130 and 131: David E. Perry, Tifton. Born July 1
- Page 132 and 133: County Court of EcholsWayne Davis,
- Page 134 and 135: Chapter IXGEORGIA COUNTY OFFICERSAN
- Page 136 and 137: County Seat........................
- Page 138 and 139: Denver Lanier, QerkSchool Superinte
Continuation SubcommitteeStarr of 44th, Chairman Gillis of 20thAllgood of 22nd H olloway of 12thBroun of 46th Kennedy of 4thBryant of 3rd Stumbaugh of 55thBanking <strong>and</strong> FinanceLester of 23rd, ChairmanColeman of I st. Vice ChairmanDawkins of 45th, SecretaryBrantley of 56thBroun of 46thCoverdellof40thGillis of 20thH olloway of 12thHudginsof 15thMcKenzie of 14thPerry of 7thPhillips of 9thScott (Tom) of 43rdStarr of 44thThompson of 32ndTurner of 8thBanking SubcommitteeCoverdell of 40th, Chairman Phillips of 9thBrantley of 56th Scott (Tom) of 43rdDawkins of 45th Starr of 44thH olloway of 12thWays <strong>and</strong> Means SubcommitteeMcKenzie of 14th, Chairman Hudgins of 15thBroun of 46th Perry of 7thColeman of 1st Thompson of 32ndGillis of 20th Turner of 8thChildren <strong>and</strong> YouthHudgins of 15th, ChairmanReddish of 6th, Vice ChairmanBurton of 5th, SecretaryBond of 39thConsumer AffairsBond of 39th, ChairmanCoggin of 35th, Vice ChairmanBarker of 18th, SecretaryThompson of 32nd, ChairmanPerry of 7th, Vice ChairmanPhillips of 9th, SecretaryDefense <strong>and</strong> Veterans AffairsBrannon of 51 stTate of 38thThompson of 32ndBrantley of 56thScott (David) of 36thBrannon of 51stMine of 52ndEconomic Development <strong>and</strong> TourismBroun of 46th, ChairmanTrulock of 10th, Vice ChairmanEngram of 34th, SecretaryCoverdell of 40thFoster of 50thGillis of 20thHarris of 27thHorton of 17thScott (David) of 36thTysinger of 41stSmall Business SubcommitteeTysinger of 41 st. Chairman Harris of 27thCoverdell of 40th Scott (David) of 36thTourism SubcommitteeFoster of 50th, Chairman Gillis of 20thEngram of 34th Trulock of 10thEducationFoster of 50th, ChairmanEngram of 34th, Vice ChairmanBurton of 5th, SecretaryDawkins of 45thDeal of 49thDean of 31stHarrison of 37thHuggins of 53rdL<strong>and</strong> of 16thPhillips of 9thStarr of 44thTateof38thLibraries SubcommitteeBurton of 5th, Chairman Dean of 31 stDeal of 49th Phillips of 9thPrimary <strong>and</strong> Secondary SubcommitteeTate of 38th, Chairman Engram of 34thDawkins of 45thVocational <strong>and</strong> Technical SubcommitteeHarrison of 37th, Chairman Starr of 44thL<strong>and</strong> of 16thFederal, State <strong>and</strong> Community AffairsScott (Tom) of 43rd, ChairmanMcKenzie of 14th, Vice ChairmanHarris of 27th, SecretaryBurton of 5thCobbof28thPeevyof48thPhillips of 9thScott (Al) of 2ndScott (David) of 36thLocal Affairs SubcommitteeMcKenzie of 14th, Chairman Harris of 27thCobb of 28th Scott (Al) of 2ndGovernmental OperationsKidd of 25th, ChairmanBrannon of 51st, Vice ChairmanReddish of 6th, SecretaryBarker of 18thBond of 39thCoggin of 35thColeman of 1stGarner of 30thHill of 29thHorton of 17thStumbaugh of 55thGovernmental Organization SubcommitteeCoggin of 35th, Chairman Littlefield of 6thColeman of 1 st Stumbaugh of 55thHorton of 17thMerit System SubcommitteeBarker of 18th, Chairman Garner of 30thBond of 39th Hill of 29thBrannon of 51stHigher EducationFincher of 54th, Chairman Broun of 46thScott (David) of 36th, Vice Chairman English of 21 stTysinger of 41 st, Secretary Hine of 52ndAllgood of 22ndScience <strong>and</strong> Technology SubcommitteeTysinger of 41st, Chairman Scott (David) of 36thBroun of 46th86