Umsobomvu Youth Fund Annual Report 2006 - Nyda
Umsobomvu Youth Fund Annual Report 2006 - Nyda Umsobomvu Youth Fund Annual Report 2006 - Nyda
statement ofcorporategovernanceYouth Advisory Centreconsultants to consider market-relatedremuneration and related benefits.The Committee met once during thefinancial year under review.The full terms of reference of thisCommittee, contained in the Charter ofthe UYF Remuneration Committee, hasbeen approved by the Board of Directors.Youth Advisory CommitteeThis is non-fiduciary Committee and its membership is to be reconstituted since theappointment of the new Board in 2004. The Committee is chaired by the ExecutiveDirector and assists the Board in providing advice on youth affairs, suitability andeffectiveness of programmes, and providing support and advice with respect to policyadvocacy with stakeholders.Record of Attendance of Board Committee Meetings for the year ended 31 March 2006:Investment Audit RemunerationDirectors Board Committee Committee CommitteeUmsobomvu Youth Fund 2006 Annual ReportChairman Adv Richard Moloko Mr Kgomoco Diseko Ms Dumo Motau Adv Richard MolokoNumber of meetings held 4 2 2 1Adv Richard Moloko 3 1 1 1Mr Malose Kekana 4 2 2 1Mr Kgomoco Diseko 2 2 N/A N/AMr Jeffrey du Preez 1 N/A 1 N/AMr Willie Madisha 1 N/A 0 N/AMs Dumo Motau 4 N/A 2 N/ADr Sean Phillips 0 2 N/A N/AMr Vishwaprea Suparsad 1 3 N/A N/A N/AMs Maphomolo Tsiki 4 2 N/A N/AMs Vuyiswa Tulelo 1 1 N/A N/AMr Tom Wixley* N/A N/A 2 N/AMr John Mansfield* N/A N/A N/A 11 Deceased February 2006.* Independent non-executive specialist and Committee Member.34
National Youth Service ProgrammeCommittees led by the CEOThe following non-Board Committees led by the Chief Executive Officer have beendelegated with the day-to-day operations and decisions of the Fund:• Executive Management Committee• Management Committee• Risk Management Committee• Procurement and Tender CommitteeExecutive Management CommitteeThe Executive Management Committee (EXCOM) of the Umsobomvu Youth Fund isconstituted to assist the Chief Executive to manage the Fund. The Chief Executive’sauthority in managing the Fund is unrestricted. The Board of Directors (Board) takesregular cognisance of authorities delegated to the Chief Executive by means ofresolutions. The EXCOM assists the Chief Executive in acting for the Board in managingthe business of the Fund when the Board is not in session, subject to the statutorylimits and the Board’s limitations on delegation of authority to the Chief Executive.The EXCOM assists the Chief Executive to guide and control the overall direction ofthe business of the Fund and acts as a medium of communication and co-ordinationbetween business units, Fund companies and the Board.Mr Mzwabantu Ntlangeni – DivisionalDirector – Process Cycle ManagementMr Roy Rajdhar – Divisional Director– Enterprise FinanceMr Derek Smith – Divisional Director– Contact Information and Counselling(promoted 1 July 2005).The following managers have a standinginvitation to attend Executive Committeemeetings:Mr Sanjay Hargovan – Risk ManagerMr Edgar Mahura – Manager – ProjectOffice: Office of the CEOMs Lebo Modiba – Manager – BusinessStrategy: Office of the CEO(appointed 3 March 2006)Mr Vincent Zwane – Manager– Information Communication andTechnologyAs at 31 March 2006, the Executive Committee consisted of:Mr Malose Kekana (Chairman) – Chief Executive OfficerMs Jennifer Law – Chief Financial OfficerMs Lucy Hlubi – Acting Divisional Director – Skills Development and Transfer(promoted 1 August 2005)Mrs Ncedi Hluyo – Divisional Director – Capacity Building and ResearchMs Nombini Mehlomakulu – Divisional Director – Corporate Communications(appointed 1 October 2005)Mr Godfrey Montshioagae – Divisional Director – Human Resources(appointed 30 May 2005)Mr Mbongeni Mtshali – Divisional Director – Business Development ServicesMr Busani Ngcaweni – Divisional Director – Skills Development and Transfer(promoted 1 July 2005 and subsequently seconded to the Office of the StatePresidency)The Executive Committee meets at leastonce a month and holds strategic planningworkshops at least twice annually.Umsobomvu Youth Fund 2006 Annual Report35
- Page 1 and 2: facilitating facilitatingjob creati
- Page 5 and 6: CapacityBuilding &ResearchProcess C
- Page 8 and 9: performancefor yearunder reviewSkil
- Page 10 and 11: oard ofdirectorsWe subscribe to aph
- Page 12 and 13: executivecommitteeUmsobomvu Youth F
- Page 14 and 15: chairman’sreportAdv Richard Molok
- Page 16 and 17: chiefexecutiveofficer’sreport“
- Page 18 and 19: chiefexecutive’sreport• Youth E
- Page 20 and 21: operationalreviewUmsobomvu Youth Fu
- Page 22 and 23: operationalreviewCompanies pledging
- Page 24 and 25: operationalreviewUmsobomvu Youth Fu
- Page 26 and 27: operationalreviewUmsobomvu Youth Fu
- Page 28 and 29: operationalreviewYouth Entrepreneur
- Page 30 and 31: operationalreviewYouth Advisory Cen
- Page 32 and 33: statement ofcorporategovernanceYout
- Page 34 and 35: statement ofcorporategovernanceall
- Page 38 and 39: statement ofcorporategovernancePhot
- Page 40 and 41: statement ofresponsibilitiesand app
- Page 42 and 43: eport ofthe auditcommitteeincomesta
- Page 44 and 45: eportof thedirectorsincomestatement
- Page 46 and 47: eportof thedirectorsincomestatement
- Page 48 and 49: incomestatementfor the year ended31
- Page 50 and 51: statementof changesin reservesfor t
- Page 52 and 53: notes to thefinancialstatementsfor
- Page 54 and 55: notes to thefinancialstatementsfor
- Page 56 and 57: notes to thefinancialstatementsfor
- Page 58 and 59: notes to thefinancialstatementsfor
- Page 60 and 61: notes to thefinancialstatementsfor
- Page 62 and 63: notes to thefinancialstatementsfor
- Page 64 and 65: notes to thefinancialstatementsfor
- Page 66 and 67: notes to thefinancialstatementsfor
- Page 68 and 69: notes to thefinancialstatementsfor
- Page 70 and 71: notes to thefinancialstatementsfor
- Page 72 and 73: notes to thefinancialstatementsfor
- Page 74 and 75: notes to thefinancialstatementsfor
- Page 76 and 77: notes to thefinancialstatementsfor
- Page 78 and 79: notes to thefinancialstatementsfor
- Page 80 and 81: notes to thefinancialstatementsfor
- Page 82 and 83: notes to thefinancialstatementsfor
- Page 84: contactinformationUmsobumvu Youth F
National <strong>Youth</strong> Service ProgrammeCommittees led by the CEOThe following non-Board Committees led by the Chief Executive Officer have beendelegated with the day-to-day operations and decisions of the <strong>Fund</strong>:• Executive Management Committee• Management Committee• Risk Management Committee• Procurement and Tender CommitteeExecutive Management CommitteeThe Executive Management Committee (EXCOM) of the <strong>Umsobomvu</strong> <strong>Youth</strong> <strong>Fund</strong> isconstituted to assist the Chief Executive to manage the <strong>Fund</strong>. The Chief Executive’sauthority in managing the <strong>Fund</strong> is unrestricted. The Board of Directors (Board) takesregular cognisance of authorities delegated to the Chief Executive by means ofresolutions. The EXCOM assists the Chief Executive in acting for the Board in managingthe business of the <strong>Fund</strong> when the Board is not in session, subject to the statutorylimits and the Board’s limitations on delegation of authority to the Chief Executive.The EXCOM assists the Chief Executive to guide and control the overall direction ofthe business of the <strong>Fund</strong> and acts as a medium of communication and co-ordinationbetween business units, <strong>Fund</strong> companies and the Board.Mr Mzwabantu Ntlangeni – DivisionalDirector – Process Cycle ManagementMr Roy Rajdhar – Divisional Director– Enterprise FinanceMr Derek Smith – Divisional Director– Contact Information and Counselling(promoted 1 July 2005).The following managers have a standinginvitation to attend Executive Committeemeetings:Mr Sanjay Hargovan – Risk ManagerMr Edgar Mahura – Manager – ProjectOffice: Office of the CEOMs Lebo Modiba – Manager – BusinessStrategy: Office of the CEO(appointed 3 March <strong>2006</strong>)Mr Vincent Zwane – Manager– Information Communication andTechnologyAs at 31 March <strong>2006</strong>, the Executive Committee consisted of:Mr Malose Kekana (Chairman) – Chief Executive OfficerMs Jennifer Law – Chief Financial OfficerMs Lucy Hlubi – Acting Divisional Director – Skills Development and Transfer(promoted 1 August 2005)Mrs Ncedi Hluyo – Divisional Director – Capacity Building and ResearchMs Nombini Mehlomakulu – Divisional Director – Corporate Communications(appointed 1 October 2005)Mr Godfrey Montshioagae – Divisional Director – Human Resources(appointed 30 May 2005)Mr Mbongeni Mtshali – Divisional Director – Business Development ServicesMr Busani Ngcaweni – Divisional Director – Skills Development and Transfer(promoted 1 July 2005 and subsequently seconded to the Office of the StatePresidency)The Executive Committee meets at leastonce a month and holds strategic planningworkshops at least twice annually.<strong>Umsobomvu</strong> <strong>Youth</strong> <strong>Fund</strong> <strong>2006</strong> <strong>Annual</strong> <strong>Report</strong>35