Sun Art Retail Group Limited - TodayIR.com
Sun Art Retail Group Limited - TodayIR.com Sun Art Retail Group Limited - TodayIR.com
REPORT OF DIRECTORS Fixed Assets Details of the movements in the fixed assets of the Group during the year ended 31 December 2012 are set out in note 10 to the consolidated financial statements. Bank Loans Details of the Group’s bank loans as at 31 December 2012 are set out in note 19 to the consolidated financial statements. Charitable Donations Charitable and other donations made by the Group during the year ended 31 December 2012 amounted to RMB5 million. Share Capital Details of the movements in share capital of the Company during the year ended 31 December 2012 are set out in Note 22(c) to the consolidated financial statements. Sufficiency of Public Float Based on the information that is publicly available to the Company and within the knowledge of the Directors, as at the latest practicable date prior to the printing of this annual report, the Company has maintained the amount of public float as approved by the Hong Kong Stock Exchange Limited (the “Stock Exchange”) and as permitted under the Rules Governing the Listing of Securities on the Stock Exchange (“Listing Rules”). Closure of Register of Members (a) For determining the entitlement to attend and vote at the 2013 AGM The Company’s register of members will be closed from 13 May 2013 (Monday) to 15 May 2013 (Wednesday), both dates inclusive, during which period no transfer of shares will be registered. To ensure that shareholders are entitled to attend and vote at the AGM, shareholders must deliver their duly stamped instruments of transfer, accompanied by the relevant share certificates, to the Company’s share registrar, Computershare Hong Kong Investor Services Limited, located at Shops 1712-1716, 17th Floor, Hopewell Centre, 183 Queen’s Road East, Wanchai, Hong Kong for registration no later than 4:30 p.m. on 10 May 2013 (Friday). (b) For determining the entitlement to the proposed final dividend The proposed Final Dividend is subject to the approval of shareholders at the 2013 AGM. For determining the entitlement to the proposed Final Dividend for the year ended 31 December 2012, the record date is fixed on 23 May 2013 (Thursday). Shareholders must deliver their duly stamped instruments of transfer, accompanied by the relevant share certificates, to the Company’s share registrar, Computershare Hong Kong Investor Services Limited, located at Shops 1712-1716, 17th Floor, Hopewell Centre, 183 Queen’s Road East, Wanchai, Hong Kong for registration no later than 4:30 p.m. on 23 May 2013 (Thursday). Sun Art Retail Group Limited Annual Report 2012 23
REPORT OF DIRECTORS Purchase, Sale or Redemption of Shares Neither the Company nor any of its subsidiaries has purchased, sold or redeemed any of the Company’s listed securities during the year ended 31 December 2012. Directors The Directors during the year ended 31 December 2012 and as of the date of this annual report were as follows: Directors as at the date of this annual report Executive directors: Bruno Robert MERCIER (Chief Executive Officer) (Appointed on 8 February 2001) (Christophe Maurice Paule Marie Joseph DUBRULLE (resigned on 12 September 2012), Philippe David BAROUKH, Xavier Marie Alain DELOM de MEZERAC and Benoit, Claude, Francois, Marie, Joseph LECLERCQ (appointed on 12 September 2012) as his alternates, save for Benoit, Claude, Francois, Marie, Joseph LECLERCQ all appointed on 13 May 2011) HUANG Ming-Tuan (Appointed on 28 April 2011) (CHENG Chuan-Tai as his alternate, appointed on 13 May 2011) Non-executive directors: CHENG Chuan-Tai (Chairman) (Appointed on 28 April 2011) (HUANG Ming-Tuan as his alternate, appointed on 13 May 2011) Benoit, Claude, Francois, Marie, Joseph LECLERCQ (Appointed on 12 September 2012), (Bruno Robert MERCIER, Philippe David BAROUKH and Xavier Marie Alain DELOM de MEZERAC as his alternates, all appointed on 12 September 2012) Philippe David BAROUKH (Appointed on 10 December 2010) (Bruno Robert MERCIER, Christophe Maurice Paule Marie Joseph DUBRULLE (resigned on 12 September 2012), Xavier Marie Alain DELOM de MEZERAC and Benoit, Claude, Francois, Marie, Joseph LECLERCQ (appointed on 12 September 2012) as his alternates, save for Benoit, Claude, Francois, Marie, Joseph LECLERCQ all appointed on 13 May 2011) Xavier Marie Alain DELOM de MEZERAC (Appointed on 8 February 2001) (Bruno Robert MERCIER, Christophe Maurice Paule Marie Joseph DUBRULLE (resigned on 12 September 2012), Philippe David BAROUKH and Benoit, Claude, Francois, Marie, Joseph LECLERCQ (appointed on 12 September 2012) as his alternates, save for Benoit, Claude, Francois, Marie, Joseph LECLERCQ all appointed on 13 May 2011) 24 Sun Art Retail Group Limited Annual Report 2012
- Page 1 and 2: Sun Art Retail Group Limited (Incor
- Page 3 and 4: CORPORATE INFORMATION DIRECTORS Exe
- Page 5 and 6: CHAIRMAN’S STATEMENT Dear Shareho
- Page 7 and 8: CHIEF EXECUTIVE OFFICER’S STATEME
- Page 9 and 10: MANAGEMENT DISCUSSION AND ANALYSIS
- Page 11 and 12: MANAGEMENT DISCUSSION AND ANALYSIS
- Page 13 and 14: MANAGEMENT DISCUSSION AND ANALYSIS
- Page 15 and 16: MANAGEMENT DISCUSSION AND ANALYSIS
- Page 17 and 18: MANAGEMENT DISCUSSION AND ANALYSIS
- Page 19 and 20: PROFILES OF DIRECTORS AND SENIOR MA
- Page 21 and 22: PROFILES OF DIRECTORS AND SENIOR MA
- Page 23: REPORT OF DIRECTORS The directors o
- Page 27 and 28: REPORT OF DIRECTORS Directors’ In
- Page 29 and 30: REPORT OF DIRECTORS (7) This repres
- Page 31 and 32: REPORT OF DIRECTORS Notes: (1) The
- Page 33 and 34: REPORT OF DIRECTORS Under the terms
- Page 35 and 36: REPORT OF DIRECTORS Audit Committee
- Page 37 and 38: RISK FACTORS • potential growth o
- Page 39 and 40: RISK FACTORS any severe communicabl
- Page 41 and 42: REPORT OF CORPORATE GOVERNANCE Inde
- Page 43 and 44: REPORT OF CORPORATE GOVERNANCE Duri
- Page 45 and 46: REPORT OF CORPORATE GOVERNANCE Remu
- Page 47 and 48: REPORT OF CORPORATE GOVERNANCE DIRE
- Page 49 and 50: REPORT OF CORPORATE GOVERNANCE COMM
- Page 51 and 52: Independent Auditor’s Report Opin
- Page 53 and 54: CONSOLIDATED STATEMENT OF FINANCIAL
- Page 55 and 56: STATEMENT OF FINANCIAL POSITION OF
- Page 57 and 58: CONSOLIDATED CASH FLOW STATEMENT Fo
- Page 59 and 60: NOTES TO THE CONSOLIDATED FINANCIAL
- Page 61 and 62: NOTES TO THE CONSOLIDATED FINANCIAL
- Page 63 and 64: NOTES TO THE CONSOLIDATED FINANCIAL
- Page 65 and 66: NOTES TO THE CONSOLIDATED FINANCIAL
- Page 67 and 68: NOTES TO THE CONSOLIDATED FINANCIAL
- Page 69 and 70: NOTES TO THE CONSOLIDATED FINANCIAL
- Page 71 and 72: NOTES TO THE CONSOLIDATED FINANCIAL
- Page 73 and 74: NOTES TO THE CONSOLIDATED FINANCIAL
REPORT OF DIRECTORS<br />
Purchase, Sale or Redemption of Shares<br />
Neither the Company nor any of its subsidiaries has purchased, sold or redeemed any of the Company’s<br />
listed securities during the year ended 31 December 2012.<br />
Directors<br />
The Directors during the year ended 31 December 2012 and as of the date of this annual report were<br />
as follows:<br />
Directors as at the date of this annual report<br />
Executive directors:<br />
Bruno Robert MERCIER (Chief Executive Officer) (Appointed on 8 February 2001)<br />
(Christophe Maurice Paule Marie Joseph DUBRULLE (resigned on 12 September 2012),<br />
Philippe David BAROUKH, Xavier Marie Alain DELOM de MEZERAC and<br />
Benoit, Claude, Francois, Marie, Joseph LECLERCQ (appointed on 12 September 2012) as his alternates,<br />
save for Benoit, Claude, Francois, Marie, Joseph LECLERCQ all appointed on 13 May 2011)<br />
HUANG Ming-Tuan (Appointed on 28 April 2011)<br />
(CHENG Chuan-Tai as his alternate, appointed on 13 May 2011)<br />
Non-executive directors:<br />
CHENG Chuan-Tai (Chairman) (Appointed on 28 April 2011)<br />
(HUANG Ming-Tuan as his alternate, appointed on 13 May 2011)<br />
Benoit, Claude, Francois, Marie, Joseph LECLERCQ (Appointed on 12 September 2012),<br />
(Bruno Robert MERCIER, Philippe David BAROUKH and Xavier Marie Alain DELOM de MEZERAC<br />
as his alternates, all appointed on 12 September 2012)<br />
Philippe David BAROUKH (Appointed on 10 December 2010)<br />
(Bruno Robert MERCIER, Christophe Maurice Paule Marie Joseph DUBRULLE<br />
(resigned on 12 September 2012), Xavier Marie Alain DELOM de MEZERAC and<br />
Benoit, Claude, Francois, Marie, Joseph LECLERCQ (appointed on 12 September 2012)<br />
as his alternates, save for Benoit, Claude, Francois, Marie, Joseph LECLERCQ<br />
all appointed on 13 May 2011)<br />
Xavier Marie Alain DELOM de MEZERAC (Appointed on 8 February 2001)<br />
(Bruno Robert MERCIER, Christophe Maurice Paule Marie Joseph DUBRULLE<br />
(resigned on 12 September 2012), Philippe David BAROUKH and<br />
Benoit, Claude, Francois, Marie, Joseph LECLERCQ (appointed on 12 September 2012)<br />
as his alternates, save for Benoit, Claude, Francois, Marie, Joseph LECLERCQ<br />
all appointed on 13 May 2011)<br />
24<br />
<strong>Sun</strong> <strong>Art</strong> <strong>Retail</strong> <strong>Group</strong> <strong>Limited</strong><br />
Annual Report 2012