Notes to the Financial Statements - Swissco Holdings Limited
Notes to the Financial Statements - Swissco Holdings Limited Notes to the Financial Statements - Swissco Holdings Limited
Board of Directors Mr Yeo Chong Lin Mr Yeo Chong Lin is our Executive Chairman since 29 January 2004, and a director of all the subsidiaries in the Group. Mr Yeo spearheads our Group’s long-term growth and development and oversees its management. He is responsible for the Group’s overall business strategy and expansion. Under his leadership, our Group has succeeded in its service strategy to provide comprehensive solutions to our customers’ marine support and logistics needs at competitive terms; complete with prompt, reliable and efficient service anytime. Mr Yeo founded Swissco Offshore in 1975. Prior to that, he worked with the then Singapore Harbour Front (Predecessor of the Port of Singapore Authority) for 19 years. Mr Alex Yeo Kian Teong Mr Alex Yeo Kian Teong is our Chief Executive Officer since 29 January 2004, and a director of all the subsidiaries in the Group. He oversees the day-to-day management of the financial, corporate and administration matters of our Group. He is also responsible for the sales and marketing for key accounts. He assists the Executive Chairman in developing business strategies of our Group, and leads in the effective management of our Group’s regional operations and expansion. Mr Alex Yeo began his career as an Operations Executive in Swissco Offshore in 1992. He then assumed the role of an Operations Manager two years later, and oversaw the business marketing for the Group. Mr Alex Yeo graduated from the University of San Francisco with a Bachelor of Science in Business Administration. Mr Alex Yeo is the son of the Executive Chairman, Mr Yeo Chong Lin. Swissco International Limited Annual Report 2009 16
Board of Directors Mr Phillip Chan Yee Foo Mr Phillip Chan was appointed as a Director on 7 June 2004. He is presently a director of Essen Pte Ltd. He previously worked for Neptune Orient Lines (NOL) for over 27 years in various executive positions and completed his career with NOL as a Consultant from 2000 to 2001. Mr Phillip Chan graduated from the University of London with a degree of Bachelor of Law (Honours). He holds a Diploma in Management Studies with Distinction conferred by the University of Chicago Graduate School of Business, in association with the National Productivity Board, Singapore (now known as SPRING Singapore). He completed the Programme in Management Development at the Harvard University Graduate School of Business Administration in Boston, USA. Mr Fong Hin Tat Mr Fong Hin Tat was appointed as a Director on 10 January 2007. Mr Fong is currently the Director of the Technical Division of Global Maritime and Port Services Pte Ltd with focus on port and maritime consultancy. Mr Fong started his career as a Deck Cadet in PanOcean Anco (1974-1979) and then a Ship Officer in Neptune Orient Lines Ltd (1979-1983). He joined the Port of Singapore Authority as a Harbour Pilot in 1983 and was appointed the Port Master (1990-1993). He was the Managing Director of Kim Heng Maritime Pte Ltd from 1994 to 1997. In 1998, Mr Fong started his own company, Far Sea Services Pte Ltd with focus on project logistics. In 2002, he was elected President of the Singapore Nautical Institute. Mr Fong obtained his master mariner qualification in 1982 and the Extra Master qualification (UK) in 1984. Mr Kwah Thiam Hock Mr Kwah Thiam Hock was appointed as a Director on 26 March 2008. Mr Kwah is a non executive director of both listed IFS Capital Limited and its wholly owned subsidiary, ECICS Limited. He is currently an independent director of Wilmar International Limited, Select Group Limited, Excelpoint Technology Limited and Teho International Inc Ltd. He is also a member of the Singapore Turf Club Management Committee and a member of the Audit Committee of Singapore Tote Board. Mr Kwah is a Fellow Member of the Australian Society of Accountants and also a Fellow Member of the Institute of Certified Public Accountants of Singapore and the Association of Chartered Certified Accountants (UK). 17 Annual Report 2009 Swissco International Limited
- Page 1 and 2: Swissco International Limited Steer
- Page 3 and 4: Corporate Profile Swissco Internati
- Page 5 and 6: Ship Repair and Maintenance Small t
- Page 7 and 8: Financial Summary FY2009 FY2008 FY2
- Page 9 and 10: Chairman’s Statement Dividend The
- Page 11 and 12: ENTRY INTO ACCOMMODATION WORK BOAT
- Page 13 and 14: Fleet Composition Our fleet has gro
- Page 15 and 16: Operations Review Our vessels AHT B
- Page 17: SW Marine (M) Sdn Bhd 49% PT Swissc
- Page 21 and 22: Key Management Mr Sam Kwai Hoong Ch
- Page 23 and 24: Corporate Governance Report Swissco
- Page 25 and 26: Corporate Governance Report The NC
- Page 27 and 28: Corporate Governance Report Executi
- Page 29 and 30: Corporate Governance Report The Aud
- Page 31 and 32: Directors' Report For the financial
- Page 33 and 34: Directors' Report For the financial
- Page 35 and 36: Directors' Report For the financial
- Page 37 and 38: Statement by Directors For the fina
- Page 39 and 40: Consolidated Statement of Comprehen
- Page 41 and 42: Consolidated Statement of Changes i
- Page 43 and 44: Notes to the Financial Statements F
- Page 45 and 46: Notes to the Financial Statements F
- Page 47 and 48: Notes to the Financial Statements F
- Page 49 and 50: Notes to the Financial Statements F
- Page 51 and 52: Notes to the Financial Statements F
- Page 53 and 54: Notes to the Financial Statements F
- Page 55 and 56: Notes to the Financial Statements F
- Page 57 and 58: Notes to the Financial Statements F
- Page 59 and 60: Notes to the Financial Statements F
- Page 61 and 62: Notes to the Financial Statements F
- Page 63 and 64: Notes to the Financial Statements F
- Page 65 and 66: Notes to the Financial Statements F
- Page 67 and 68: Notes to the Financial Statements F
Board of Direc<strong>to</strong>rs<br />
Mr Phillip Chan Yee Foo<br />
Mr Phillip Chan was appointed as a Direc<strong>to</strong>r on 7 June 2004. He is presently a<br />
direc<strong>to</strong>r of Essen Pte Ltd. He previously worked for Neptune Orient Lines (NOL)<br />
for over 27 years in various executive positions and completed his career with<br />
NOL as a Consultant from 2000 <strong>to</strong> 2001.<br />
Mr Phillip Chan graduated from <strong>the</strong> University of London with a degree of<br />
Bachelor of Law (Honours). He holds a Diploma in Management Studies with<br />
Distinction conferred by <strong>the</strong> University of Chicago Graduate School of Business,<br />
in association with <strong>the</strong> National Productivity Board, Singapore (now known as<br />
SPRING Singapore). He completed <strong>the</strong> Programme in Management Development<br />
at <strong>the</strong> Harvard University Graduate School of Business Administration in Bos<strong>to</strong>n,<br />
USA.<br />
Mr Fong Hin Tat<br />
Mr Fong Hin Tat was appointed as a Direc<strong>to</strong>r on 10 January 2007. Mr Fong<br />
is currently <strong>the</strong> Direc<strong>to</strong>r of <strong>the</strong> Technical Division of Global Maritime and Port<br />
Services Pte Ltd with focus on port and maritime consultancy.<br />
Mr Fong started his career as a Deck Cadet in PanOcean Anco (1974-1979) and<br />
<strong>the</strong>n a Ship Officer in Neptune Orient Lines Ltd (1979-1983). He joined <strong>the</strong> Port<br />
of Singapore Authority as a Harbour Pilot in 1983 and was appointed <strong>the</strong> Port<br />
Master (1990-1993). He was <strong>the</strong> Managing Direc<strong>to</strong>r of Kim Heng Maritime Pte Ltd<br />
from 1994 <strong>to</strong> 1997. In 1998, Mr Fong started his own company, Far Sea Services<br />
Pte Ltd with focus on project logistics. In 2002, he was elected President of <strong>the</strong><br />
Singapore Nautical Institute.<br />
Mr Fong obtained his master mariner qualification in 1982 and <strong>the</strong> Extra Master<br />
qualification (UK) in 1984.<br />
Mr Kwah Thiam Hock<br />
Mr Kwah Thiam Hock was appointed as a Direc<strong>to</strong>r on 26 March 2008. Mr Kwah is<br />
a non executive direc<strong>to</strong>r of both listed IFS Capital <strong>Limited</strong> and its wholly owned<br />
subsidiary, ECICS <strong>Limited</strong>. He is currently an independent direc<strong>to</strong>r of Wilmar<br />
International <strong>Limited</strong>, Select Group <strong>Limited</strong>, Excelpoint Technology <strong>Limited</strong><br />
and Teho International Inc Ltd. He is also a member of <strong>the</strong> Singapore Turf Club<br />
Management Committee and a member of <strong>the</strong> Audit Committee of Singapore<br />
Tote Board.<br />
Mr Kwah is a Fellow Member of <strong>the</strong> Australian Society of Accountants and also a<br />
Fellow Member of <strong>the</strong> Institute of Certified Public Accountants of Singapore and<br />
<strong>the</strong> Association of Chartered Certified Accountants (UK).<br />
17 Annual Report 2009 <strong>Swissco</strong> International <strong>Limited</strong>