Annual report 2004 (PDF, 4141 kB) - Unicredit Bank
Annual report 2004 (PDF, 4141 kB) - Unicredit Bank Annual report 2004 (PDF, 4141 kB) - Unicredit Bank
5. Detriment to Živnostenská banka in connection with contracts and measures made: The Board of Directors of Živnostenská banka declares that Živnostenská banka suffered no detriment in connection with contracts and measures made. Prague, dated 10 March 2005 On behalf of the Board of Directors of Živnostenská banka Jiří Kunert Chairman of the Board of Directors Aleš Barabas Member of the Board of Directors 120
Supplementary Data in Conformity with the Measure of the Ministry of Finance of the Czech Republic, ref 282/73391/2001, from 7 December 2001 1. Data about the members of the Supervisory Board and the Board of Directors 1.1. The Supervisory Board as at 31 December 2004 Name Post Commencement of post Qualification Carmine Ferraro Chairman 29 July 2003 university and many years of practical experience in banking Massimiliano Moi Deputy Chairman 29 July 2003 university and many years of practical experience in banking Ivana Burešová member 24 June 2004 university and many years of practical experience in banking Vladimír Burian member 24 June 2004 secondary school and many years of practical experience in banking Alberto Devoto member 11 March 2004 university and many years of practical experience in banking Uwe Kruschinski member 12 March 2003 university and many years of practical experience in banking Franjo Luković*) member 10 September 2003 university and many years of practical experience in banking Eva Mikulková member 10 June 2003 secondary school and many years of practical experience in banking Andrea Varese member 12 November 2003 university and many years of practical experience in banking Membership in the bodies of other companies Vice Chairman of the SupB: UniBanka, a.s. none none none none Member of the BoDir: Bankgesellschaft Berlin AG Chairman of the BoDir: Zagrebaćka banka Chairman of the SupB: Pliva Zagreb none Chairman of the SupB: Pekao Leasing Sp. zoo Member of the BoDir: KocBank S.A.(Turkey) Locat Leasing Croatia Locat Leasing Russia *) Mr Franjo Luković resigned from his position as at 19 January 2005 and Mr Giuseppe Vovk was coopted instead of him at the same date (he must be yet elected by the Annual General Meeting in April 2005) 121
- Page 69 and 70: Schedule to the Consolidated Financ
- Page 71 and 72: (c) Foreign currencies The consolid
- Page 73 and 74: (h) Sale and repurchase agreements
- Page 75 and 76: Property, plant and equipment and i
- Page 77 and 78: 3 NET FEE AND COMMISSION INCOME 31
- Page 79 and 80: 7 OPERATING EXPENSES Operating expe
- Page 81 and 82: The tax on the operating profit dif
- Page 83 and 84: 13 STATE TREASURY AND OTHER BILLS E
- Page 85 and 86: 31 December 2004 31 December 2003 N
- Page 87 and 88: 18 SECURITIES AVAILABLE-FOR-SALE 31
- Page 89 and 90: Property, plant and equipment Dispo
- Page 91 and 92: y 29 December 2014, with no repayme
- Page 93 and 94: The following table indicates the c
- Page 95 and 96: (b) Capital adequacy To monitor the
- Page 97 and 98: Geographical concentrations of asse
- Page 99 and 100: market movements. The Board of Dire
- Page 101 and 102: CZK USD GBP EUR Other Total As at 3
- Page 103 and 104: As at 31 December 2004 Up to 1-3 3-
- Page 105 and 106: The table below summarises the effe
- Page 107 and 108: Maturities of assets and liabilitie
- Page 109 and 110: to be completely matched since busi
- Page 111 and 112: 34 RELATED PARTY TRANSACTIONS Parti
- Page 113 and 114: Non-Audited Supplemental Informatio
- Page 115 and 116: NON-AUDITED RECONCILIATION OF THE I
- Page 117 and 118: Report on Relations between the Con
- Page 119: 1.4. In addition to the above menti
- Page 123 and 124: 1.3. The Board of Directors as at 3
- Page 125 and 126: - supplementary investment services
- Page 127 and 128: was launched aimed to introduce the
- Page 129 and 130: Other Top Managers of Živnostensk
5. Detriment to Živnostenská banka in connection with contracts and measures made:<br />
The Board of Directors of Živnostenská banka declares that Živnostenská banka suffered no<br />
detriment in connection with contracts and measures made.<br />
Prague, dated 10 March 2005<br />
On behalf of the Board of Directors of Živnostenská banka<br />
Jiří Kunert<br />
Chairman of the Board of Directors<br />
Aleš Barabas<br />
Member of the Board of Directors<br />
120