ANNUAL REPORTS
ANNUAL REPORTS
ANNUAL REPORTS
Create successful ePaper yourself
Turn your PDF publications into a flip-book with our unique Google optimized e-Paper software.
• HASMA Investments (Pty) Ltd: Nonexecutive<br />
Director<br />
• Jodya cc: Member<br />
• LMD Africa Chartered Accountants<br />
Inc: Non-executive Director<br />
• LMD Africa Forensics (Pty) Ltd: Nonexecutive<br />
Director<br />
• Mlando Investments (Pty) Ltd: Nonexecutive<br />
Director<br />
• Omar Aboobaker Latiff Family Trust:<br />
Trustee<br />
• PricewaterhouseCoopers Advisory<br />
Services (Pty) Ltd: Director<br />
• PricewaterhouseCoopers<br />
Incorporated: Director<br />
• PricewaterhouseCoopers<br />
Partnership: Partner<br />
• Project Preparation Trust: Trustee<br />
8. MRS WENDy LUCAS-BULL (58)<br />
Executive Director: Peotona Group<br />
Holdings (Pty) Ltd<br />
DBSA Director as from: 1 August 2005<br />
Academic qualifications:<br />
• BSc, University of the Witwatersrand<br />
(1976)<br />
Other directorships:<br />
• Anglo-Platinum (Pty) Ltd: Nonexecutive<br />
Director<br />
• Eskom Holdings Ltd: Non-executive<br />
Director<br />
• IQ Group (Pty) Ltd: Non-executive<br />
Director<br />
• Nedbank Group Ltd: Non-executive<br />
Director<br />
9. Dr CLAUDIA MANNING (44)<br />
Executive Director: Sangena<br />
Investments<br />
DBSA Director as from: 1 August 2005<br />
Academic qualifications:<br />
• DPhil, University of Sussex (1996)<br />
• MPhil, University of Sussex (1992)<br />
• BA Hons (Economic History),<br />
University of Natal (1988)<br />
• BA (Economic History; English),<br />
University of Natal (1987)<br />
Other directorships:<br />
• DBSA Development Fund: Nonexecutive<br />
Director<br />
• ECIAfrica: Managing Director<br />
• Roadcrete Africa (Pty) Ltd: Nonexecutive<br />
Director<br />
DBSA CORPORATE SECRETARy<br />
Mrs Bathobile Sowazi<br />
Company Secretary, DBSA, PO Box<br />
1234, Halfway House, 1685<br />
DBSA Board members<br />
during the year under<br />
review<br />
10. Mr JayASEELAN NAIDOO (56)<br />
Director: J&J Group<br />
Chairman of the DBSA Board between:<br />
24 August 2000 and 31 August 2010<br />
11. Dr LULU GWAGWA (52)<br />
Chief Operating Officer: Lereko<br />
Investment Holdings<br />
DBSA Director between:<br />
1 August 2004 and 21 October 2010<br />
12. PROF. EDWARD ChARLES<br />
WEBSTER (68)<br />
Professor of Sociology, University of<br />
the Witwatersrand<br />
DBSA Director between:<br />
1 August 2007 and 31 January 2011<br />
13. Mr IvAN MzIMELA (49)<br />
Chairman: Hollard Risk Capital<br />
Executive Director:<br />
Capricorn Ventures International<br />
DBSA Director between:<br />
1 August 2007 and 31 January 2011<br />
14. MS T RAMANO (39)<br />
Chief Financial Officer: WIPHOLD<br />
Group<br />
DBSA Director between:<br />
1 August 2007 and 21 April 2010<br />
7. Mr Omar Aboobaker Latiff 8. Mrs Wendy Lucas-Bull 9. Dr Claudia Manning<br />
DBSA | <strong>ANNUAL</strong> REPORT 2010/2011 8