The Record 2009 - Keble College - University of Oxford
The Record 2009 - Keble College - University of Oxford The Record 2009 - Keble College - University of Oxford
The College at Large John Walter Lloyd Zehetmayr OBE (HT 1941) We have had recent notification of the following deaths. Full obituaries will be included in the next issue of The Record. died on 3 July 2009 aged 87. He was educated at St Paul’s School, came up to Keble to read Botany and was a member of the University Rover Scout Group. After one year he was called up and commissioned into the Royal Naval Reserve (1942). He was a Radar Officer on HMS Ulster Queen (1944), a Fighter Direction Vessel and he was Mentioned in Despatches (1945). He returned to Keble after the war and read Forestry (1947). He joined the Forestry Commission as a Forest Officer and was an Assistant Research Silviculturist (1948–56), Head of Work Study (1956–64), Conservator of Forests for West Scotland (1964–6) and finally Senior Officer for Wales (1966–81). He was a member of the Prince of Wales Committee and related groups (1968–89). He had remained in the Royal Naval Volunteer Reserve after the war, received their decoration (VRD, 1963) and retired as a Lieutenant Commander (1966). He had been a voluntary Warden at the Lavernock Point nature reserve in Penarth since 1976 and he continued after retirement. He was awarded a special commendation at the Wales Volunteer of the Year Awards held at the Senedd in Cardiff Bay (2007) for 30 years service. He served on the Brecon Beacon National Park Committee (1982–91) and was Chairman of the Forestry Safety Council (1986–92). He was awarded an OBE (1991) and was made Honorary Vice-President of the Wildlife Trust of South and West Wales (2008). He published many articles on forestry. For over 20 years he was a voluntary ski instructor on the Fairwater artificial ski slope and it was there at the age of 86 he fell and broke his leg. He had already had a double heart bypass, been fitted with a pacemaker and suffered breathlessness from lung cancer. His wife Betty died last year (2008) but he is survived by their children Brian, Peter and Susan. Ronald Edward Burdgett (1959, History) died 26 September 2009. Watutantirige De Alwis (1959, Law) died 2009. Peter Crevie Lee (1959, Geography) died 5 June 2009. Ralph Gregory Pearce (1948, English) died 11 September 2009. 97
Keble College: The Record 2009 David Senior, President, writes: The Keble Association The provision of financial support to those undergraduates and graduates who are suffering financial hardship or who are undertaking challenging projects in furtherance of their education, lies at the heart of the work of the Keble Association, which draws its resources from the subscriptions and donations of Old Members and the income received from this investment. Notwithstanding the fall in the value of the Association’s investment in the light of the international financial situation, the Association’s income continued to match its expenditure on grants. At the time of its 2009 AGM, the total sum provided by the Association was £35,600, £7,800 more than in the previous year. A total of 122 individual grants had been awarded, with an equal division between male and female students, and 66 going to undergraduates and 56 to graduates. Graduates were more strongly represented in the study fund, and undergraduates drew more strongly on funding for travel. The AGM was held in College on Saturday 4 July 2009 and in the absence of the President, the chair was taken by Vivek Sharma (1988), Executive Committee Member and past Treasurer of the Association. The Secretary, Scott Barnes (1975), reported that the Trustees had met twice during the past twelve months and the Executive Committee three times (October 2008, January and April 2009). Three retiring Trustees, Tony Hewlett (1964), Angela Fox (1993) and Nicholas Fox (1994) were re-elected for a further five year term. During the year, Julie Hutton (née Willcox 1983) assumed the responsibilities of Membership Secretary and Chris Scott (1988) gave up his responsibilities for developing contacts with today’s junior members after laying a firm foundation for this important element of the Trustees’ duties. Work is now proceeding on redefining and expanding the work Chris undertook. One of the responsibilities of the Trustees is to ensure that information about its activities is readily accessible to members; in addition to the printed Annual Review, the Association website provides up-to-date information about its activities. During the AGM, the Chairman placed on record the Association’s thanks to the Chairman, Stan Szaroleta (1968) and 98
- Page 47 and 48: Keble College: The Record 2009 subj
- Page 49 and 50: Keble College: The Record 2009 But
- Page 51 and 52: Keble College: The Record 2009 euph
- Page 53 and 54: Keble College: The Record 2009 who
- Page 55 and 56: Keble College: The Record 2009 Pond
- Page 57 and 58: Keble College: The Record 2009 curr
- Page 59 and 60: Keble College: The Record 2009 trav
- Page 61 and 62: Keble College: The Record 2009 Gift
- Page 63 and 64: Keble College: The Record 2009 Mr J
- Page 65 and 66: Keble College: The Record 2009 Mr R
- Page 67 and 68: Keble College: The Record 2009 Mr M
- Page 69 and 70: Keble College: The Record 2009 Ms V
- Page 71 and 72: Keble College: The Record 2009 Mr L
- Page 73 and 74: Keble College: The Record 2009 up r
- Page 75 and 76: Keble College: The Record 2009 of S
- Page 77 and 78: Keble College: The Record 2009 He d
- Page 79 and 80: Keble College: The Record 2009 Hist
- Page 81 and 82: Keble College: The Record 2009 whom
- Page 83 and 84: Keble College: The Record 2009 Will
- Page 85 and 86: Keble College: The Record 2009 Dyfe
- Page 87 and 88: Keble College: The Record 2009 Soci
- Page 89 and 90: Keble College: The Record 2009 Rode
- Page 91 and 92: Keble College: The Record 2009 Elwy
- Page 93 and 94: Keble College: The Record 2009 be C
- Page 95 and 96: Keble College: The Record 2009 Afri
- Page 97: Keble College: The Record 2009 in 1
- Page 101 and 102: Keble College: The Record 2009 the
- Page 103 and 104: Keble College: The Record 2009 Purk
- Page 105 and 106: Keble College: The Record 2009 Darb
- Page 107 and 108: Keble College: The Record 2009 Mora
- Page 109 and 110: Keble College: The Record 2009 III
- Page 111 and 112: Keble College: The Record 2009 Sam
- Page 113 and 114: Keble College: The Record 2009 Will
- Page 115 and 116: Keble College: The Record 2009 Tori
- Page 117 and 118: Keble College: The Record 2009 116
- Page 119 and 120: Keble College: The Record 2009 Scho
- Page 121 and 122: Keble College: The Record 2009 Zhen
- Page 123 and 124: Keble College: The Record 2009 Bang
- Page 125 and 126: Keble College: The Record 2008 News
- Page 127 and 128: Keble College: The Record 2008 Anth
- Page 129 and 130: Keble College: The Record 2008 1978
- Page 131 and 132: Keble College: The Record 2008 1996
- Page 133: Keble College: The Record 2008 10
- Page 136 and 137: Friday 24 September Retirement Dinn
<strong>The</strong> <strong>College</strong> at Large<br />
John Walter Lloyd<br />
Zehetmayr OBE (HT 1941)<br />
We have had recent notification<br />
<strong>of</strong> the following deaths. Full<br />
obituaries will be included in the<br />
next issue <strong>of</strong> <strong>The</strong> <strong>Record</strong>.<br />
died on 3 July <strong>2009</strong> aged 87. He was educated at St Paul’s<br />
School, came up to <strong>Keble</strong> to read Botany and was a member <strong>of</strong><br />
the <strong>University</strong> Rover Scout Group. After one year he was called<br />
up and commissioned into the Royal Naval Reserve (1942). He<br />
was a Radar Officer on HMS Ulster Queen (1944), a Fighter<br />
Direction Vessel and he was Mentioned in Despatches (1945).<br />
He returned to <strong>Keble</strong> after the war and read Forestry (1947).<br />
He joined the Forestry Commission as a Forest Officer and was<br />
an Assistant Research Silviculturist (1948–56), Head <strong>of</strong> Work<br />
Study (1956–64), Conservator <strong>of</strong> Forests for West Scotland<br />
(1964–6) and finally Senior Officer for Wales (1966–81). He was<br />
a member <strong>of</strong> the Prince <strong>of</strong> Wales Committee and related groups<br />
(1968–89). He had remained in the Royal Naval Volunteer<br />
Reserve after the war, received their decoration (VRD, 1963)<br />
and retired as a Lieutenant Commander (1966). He had been<br />
a voluntary Warden at the Lavernock Point nature reserve in<br />
Penarth since 1976 and he continued after retirement. He was<br />
awarded a special commendation at the Wales Volunteer <strong>of</strong><br />
the Year Awards held at the Senedd in Cardiff Bay (2007) for<br />
30 years service. He served on the Brecon Beacon National<br />
Park Committee (1982–91) and was Chairman <strong>of</strong> the Forestry<br />
Safety Council (1986–92). He was awarded an OBE (1991) and<br />
was made Honorary Vice-President <strong>of</strong> the Wildlife Trust <strong>of</strong><br />
South and West Wales (2008). He published many articles on<br />
forestry. For over 20 years he was a voluntary ski instructor<br />
on the Fairwater artificial ski slope and it was there at the age<br />
<strong>of</strong> 86 he fell and broke his leg. He had already had a double<br />
heart bypass, been fitted with a pacemaker and suffered<br />
breathlessness from lung cancer. His wife Betty died last year<br />
(2008) but he is survived by their children Brian, Peter and<br />
Susan.<br />
Ronald Edward Burdgett (1959, History) died 26 September<br />
<strong>2009</strong>.<br />
Watutantirige De Alwis (1959, Law) died <strong>2009</strong>.<br />
Peter Crevie Lee (1959, Geography) died 5 June <strong>2009</strong>.<br />
Ralph Gregory Pearce (1948, English) died 11 September<br />
<strong>2009</strong>.<br />
97