RED HERRING PROSPECTUS Dated August 24 ... - Globus Spirits
RED HERRING PROSPECTUS Dated August 24 ... - Globus Spirits RED HERRING PROSPECTUS Dated August 24 ... - Globus Spirits
Further, the Directors are also interested to the extent of Equity Shares, if any, already held by them or their relatives in the Company, or that may be subscribed for and allotted to them, out of the present Issue in terms of this Red Herring Prospectus and also to the extent of any dividend payable to them and other distributions in respect of the said Equity Shares. Except as stated otherwise in this Red Herring Prospectus, the Company has not entered into any Contract, Agreements or Arrangements during the preceding two years from the date of the Red Herring Prospectus in which the directors are interested directly or indirectly and no payments have been made to them in respect of the contracts, agreements or arrangements which are proposed to be entered with them. Changes in Directors in the last three years Sl. No Name Date of Appointment Date of Cessation Reason 1. Mr. Kanshi Prasad Pandey 1.12.2006 Resignation 2. Mr. Ajay Kumar Swarup 1.12.2006 - Appointment as Managing Director 3. Mr. Rajesh Kumar Malik 1.12.2006 - Appointment as Whole- Time Director 4. Mr. Rameshwar Dayal Aggarwal 1.12.2006 - Appointment as Whole- Time Director 5. Mr. Ashok Kumar 20.2.2007 Resignation 6. Mr. Deepak Roy 20.2.2007 - Appointment 7. Mr. Joginder Singh Dhamija 20.2.2007 - Appointment as Additional Director 8. Mr. Santosh Kumar Bishwal 20.2.2007 - Appointment as Additional Director 9. Mr. Madhav Kumar Swarup 17.4.2007 Resignation. Mr. Madhav Kumar Swarup was appointed as Additional Director on 16.3.2004 which was confirmed in the AGM held on 30.9.2004. He resigned on 17.4.2007 on account of the fact that his age did not permit him to take the enhanced responsibility of the Company’s ongoing business and expansion plans. 10. Mr. Manik Lal Dutta 1.82009 - Re Appointment as Executive Director 137
ORGANISATION CHART-GLOBUS SPIRITS LIMITED MANAGEMENT ORGANISATION STRUCTURE The Company’s organization structure for its Corporate Office and operating units is given in the following diagrams as outlined in Chart 1, Chart 2 and Chart 3: Board of Directors Managing Director Ajay Kumar Swarup Whole-Time Director Manik Lal Dutta Behror Unit Rajasthan Samalkha Unit Haryana Corporate Office Delhi Chart 1 Chart 2 Chart 3 138
- Page 114 and 115: FLOW CHART OF FINISHING GOODS Recti
- Page 116 and 117: The availability of grain particula
- Page 118 and 119: Domestic - 10 KL Per Day TOTAL - 14
- Page 120 and 121: Power Generation Present Requiremen
- Page 122 and 123: The Spent Wash generated from disti
- Page 124 and 125: • White Lace Duet Gin GR 8 Times
- Page 126 and 127: Indian IMFL Industry has undergone
- Page 128 and 129: Certificate dated 23 rd January 200
- Page 130 and 131: 6. Manufacturing Agreement Parties:
- Page 132 and 133: its distinct identity in the Countr
- Page 134 and 135: PROPERTY A. Properties owned by the
- Page 136 and 137: Date of Agreement: 25.3.1995 vide D
- Page 138 and 139: Date of Agreement: 12.1.1995 vide D
- Page 140 and 141: 27. M/s Globus Agronics Limited Dat
- Page 142 and 143: Parties Sub-Lessor Associated Disti
- Page 144 and 145: Class 33 (Thirty Three) Applicant G
- Page 146 and 147: Sr. No Mark Registration Number Cla
- Page 148 and 149: BRIEF HISTORY AND OTHER CORPORATE M
- Page 150 and 151: 22.08.1995 • Change in Authorised
- Page 152 and 153: DIN: 00769308 01.08.2009) Term: 3 y
- Page 154 and 155: Limited in 1983 and later promoted
- Page 156 and 157: Industrial Engineer where he was re
- Page 158 and 159: If at any time the director ceases
- Page 160 and 161: CORPORATE GOVERNANCE CORPORATE GOVE
- Page 162 and 163: 1. To scrutinize the Share transfer
- Page 166 and 167: Chart 1: BEHROR UNIT, RAJASTHAN 139
- Page 168 and 169: 141
- Page 170 and 171: joined Radico Khaitan Limited in 19
- Page 172 and 173: PROMOTERS Mr. Ajay Kumar Swarup and
- Page 174 and 175: Sl. No. Name of Shareholder No. of
- Page 176 and 177: Related Party Transactions For deta
- Page 178 and 179: estatements and regroupings as cons
- Page 180 and 181: ANNEXURE-II STATEMENT OF PROFIT & L
- Page 182 and 183: At each balance sheet an assessment
- Page 184 and 185: Particulars Key Management Personal
- Page 186 and 187: Particulars Associates Key Manageme
- Page 188 and 189: ENA BL 44.93 1477.37 14.06 1080.81
- Page 190 and 191: AS ON PARTICULARS 31-Mar-05 31-Mar-
- Page 192 and 193: guaranteed by Sh. Madhav K. Swarup
- Page 194 and 195: ANNEXURE-XI STATEMENT OF CURRENT LI
- Page 196 and 197: Note: ** Information pertaining to
- Page 198 and 199: EXISTING BORROWING FACILITIES The C
- Page 200 and 201: Prepayment Charges: 2% of the Prepa
- Page 202 and 203: losses and deferred expenditure not
- Page 204 and 205: There are no defaults in meeting an
- Page 206 and 207: 3. Networth means aggregate of valu
- Page 208 and 209: SHAREHOLDING Sl. No. Name of Shareh
- Page 210 and 211: horticulture and agriculture in all
- Page 212 and 213: There are no defaults in meeting an
Further, the Directors are also interested to the extent of Equity Shares, if any, already held by<br />
them or their relatives in the Company, or that may be subscribed for and allotted to them, out<br />
of the present Issue in terms of this Red Herring Prospectus and also to the extent of any<br />
dividend payable to them and other distributions in respect of the said Equity Shares.<br />
Except as stated otherwise in this Red Herring Prospectus, the Company has not entered into<br />
any Contract, Agreements or Arrangements during the preceding two years from the date of the<br />
Red Herring Prospectus in which the directors are interested directly or indirectly and no<br />
payments have been made to them in respect of the contracts, agreements or arrangements<br />
which are proposed to be entered with them.<br />
Changes in Directors in the last three years<br />
Sl.<br />
No<br />
Name<br />
Date of<br />
Appointment<br />
Date of<br />
Cessation<br />
Reason<br />
1. Mr. Kanshi Prasad Pandey 1.12.2006 Resignation<br />
2. Mr. Ajay Kumar Swarup 1.12.2006 - Appointment as<br />
Managing Director<br />
3. Mr. Rajesh Kumar Malik 1.12.2006 - Appointment as Whole-<br />
Time Director<br />
4. Mr. Rameshwar Dayal<br />
Aggarwal<br />
1.12.2006 - Appointment as Whole-<br />
Time Director<br />
5. Mr. Ashok Kumar 20.2.2007 Resignation<br />
6. Mr. Deepak Roy 20.2.2007 - Appointment<br />
7. Mr. Joginder Singh Dhamija 20.2.2007 - Appointment as<br />
Additional Director<br />
8. Mr. Santosh Kumar Bishwal 20.2.2007 - Appointment as<br />
Additional Director<br />
9. Mr. Madhav Kumar Swarup 17.4.2007 Resignation. Mr. Madhav<br />
Kumar Swarup was<br />
appointed as Additional<br />
Director on 16.3.2004<br />
which was confirmed in<br />
the AGM held on<br />
30.9.2004. He resigned<br />
on 17.4.2007 on<br />
account of the fact that<br />
his age did not permit<br />
him to take the<br />
enhanced responsibility<br />
of the Company’s<br />
ongoing business and<br />
expansion plans.<br />
10. Mr. Manik Lal Dutta 1.82009 - Re Appointment as<br />
Executive Director<br />
137