China Data Supplement February 2007
China Data Supplement February 2007 China Data Supplement February 2007
China aktuell Data Supplement – PRC, Hong Kong SAR, Macau SAR, Taiwan 61 Minister of Examination: LIN Chia-cheng (Lin Jiacheng) Minister of Civil Service: CHU Wu-hsien (Zhu Wuxian) Chairperson of the Civil Service Protection and Training Commission: LIU Shou-cheng (Liu Shoucheng) Chairperson of the Supervisory Board of Public Service Pension Fund: WU Rong-ming (Wu Rongming) Control Branch (Yuan) President: Fredrick Fu CHIEN (Qian Fu) Vice-President: CHEN Meng-ling (Chen Mengling) Secretary-General: TU Shan-liang (Du Shanliang) National Audit Office Auditor-General: SU Chen-ping (Su Zhenping) Straits Exchange Foundation Chairperson: CHANG Chun-hsiung (Zhang Junxiong) Cross-Strait Common Market Foundation Chairperson: Vincent SIEW (Xiao Wanzhang) Military Chief of the General Staff: Gen HOU Shou-yeh (Huo Shouye) Dep.Chiefs: Gen CHU Kai-sheng (Zhu Kaisheng), Adm WANG Li-shen (Wang Lishen), Gen WU Ta-peng (Wu Dapeng) Director of the General Political Warfare Department: WU Ta-peng Commander-in-Chief, Army: Gen CHAO Shih-chang (Zhao Shizhang) Commander-in-Chief, Navy: Adm LIN Chen-yi (Lin Zhenyi) Commander-in-Chief, Air Force: Gen SHEN Kuo-chen (Shen Guozhen) Commander-in-Chief, Combined Logistics Command: Lt Gen CHIN Nai-chieh (Jin Naijie) Commander-in-Chief, Armed Forces Reserve Command: Gen YU Lien-fa (Yu Lianfa) Commander of the Military Police Command: Gen LU Tai-sheng (Lu Taisheng) President of the National Defense University: Gen TSENG Chin-ling (Zeng Jinling) Fujian Provincial Government Governor: YEN Chung-cheng (Yan Zhongcheng) Taipei City Government Mayor: HAU Lung-bin (Hao Longbin) Vice-Mayor: Samuel Shiouh-guang WU (Wu Xiuguang) Kaohsiung City Government Mayor: CHEN Chu (Chen Ju) (f) Political Parties Pan-green coalition Democratic Progressive Party (DPP) Chairperson: YU Shyi-kun (You Xikun) Secretary-General: LIN Chia-lung (Lin Jialong) Taiwan Solidarity Union Chairperson: Huang Kun-hui (Huang Kunhui) Secretary-General: LIN Chih-chia (Lin Zhijia) Pan-blue coalition Kuomintang (KMT) Hon.Chm.: LIAN Chan (Lian Zhan) Chairperson: MA Ying-jeou (Ma Yingjiu) (resigned on 13 Feb 07) V.-Chp.: CHANG Jen-hsiang (Zhang Renxiang), CHIANG Pin-kung (Jiang Bingkun), John KUAN (Guan Zhong), LIN Yi-shih (Lin Yishi), WU Poh-hsiung (Wu Boxiong) Secretary-General: WU Den-yih (Wu Dunyi) People First Party Chairperson: James SOONG Chu-yu (Song Chuyu) V.-Chp.: CHANG Chau-hsiung (Zhang Zhaoxiong) Secretary-General: CHIN Chin-sheng (Qin Jinsheng) New Party (NP) Chairperson: YOK Mu-ming (Yu Muming) Secretary-General: WANG Chien-shien (Wang Jianxuan) Not part of any coalition Non-Partisan Solidarity Union Chairperson: CHANG Po-ya (Zhang Boya) (f)
62 February 2007 Taiwan Social Data Population (1000) 2004 2005 Total 22,689 22,770 - Growth Rate (%) 0.37 0.36 - Male 11,542 11,562 - Female 11,148 11,208 Population Density (per sq.km) 626.98 629.22 Labor Force and Employment Total Social Labor Force (1000) 10,240 10,371 Employed (1000) 9,786 9,942 by Agriculture 642 591 Industry 3,446 3,558 Services 5,698 5,793 Unemployment Rate (%) 4.4 4.1 Monthly Work Hours by Manufacturing Industry (Ave.p.Empl.) 191 189 Monthly Earnings by Manufacturing Industry (Ave.p.Empl.) NT$ 40,611 41,751 Indices of Labor Productivity in Manufacturing Industry (2001=100) 122.13 128.55 Education (Enrolment) Primary Education 1,883,533 1,832,017 Secondary Education 1,692,721 1,703,468 Higher Education 1,285,867 1,296,558 Abbreviations: Gov. = Government m = million p = provisional figures Sources: Taiwan Statistical Data Book 2004, Council for Economic Planning and Development, Taipei; Directorate-General of Budget, Accounting and Statistics, Executive Yuan, Taipei.
- Page 11 and 12: 10 February 2007 Water Resources Mi
- Page 13 and 14: 12 February 2007 Chinese Academy of
- Page 15 and 16: 14 February 2007 Leading Group on t
- Page 17 and 18: 16 February 2007 Vice-Chairpersons:
- Page 19 and 20: 18 February 2007 ECONOMIC ORGANIZAT
- Page 21 and 22: 20 February 2007 Everbright Securit
- Page 23 and 24: 22 February 2007 President: Jin Yun
- Page 25 and 26: 24 February 2007 Dir.Pol.Dpt.: Gao
- Page 27 and 28: 26 February 2007 MASS ORGANIZATIONS
- Page 29 and 30: 28 February 2007 CHINESE PEOPLE’S
- Page 31 and 32: 30 February 2007 The Main Provincia
- Page 33 and 34: 32 February 2007 Zhao Shiju 98/04 G
- Page 35 and 36: 34 February 2007 Zhao Tingjie 03/01
- Page 37 and 38: 36 February 2007 Li Xinguang 03/03
- Page 39 and 40: 38 February 2007 Identified as vice
- Page 41 and 42: 40 February 2007 Wang Xiao (王晓)
- Page 43 and 44: 42 February 2007 training, had serv
- Page 45 and 46: 44 February 2007 measures at a pres
- Page 47 and 48: 46 February 2007 Article 9: The exp
- Page 49 and 50: 48 February 2007 Hong Kong SAR LIU
- Page 51 and 52: 50 February 2007 Controller, Govern
- Page 53 and 54: 52 February 2007 Hong Kong SAR Soci
- Page 55 and 56: 54 February 2007 Hong Kong SAR Econ
- Page 57 and 58: 56 February 2007 Public Security Fo
- Page 59 and 60: 58 February 2007 Macau SAR Economic
- Page 61: 60 February 2007 Coast Guard Admini
<strong>China</strong> aktuell <strong>Data</strong> <strong>Supplement</strong> – PRC, Hong Kong SAR, Macau SAR, Taiwan 61<br />
Minister of Examination: LIN Chia-cheng (Lin Jiacheng)<br />
Minister of Civil Service: CHU Wu-hsien (Zhu Wuxian)<br />
Chairperson of the Civil Service Protection and Training<br />
Commission: LIU Shou-cheng (Liu Shoucheng)<br />
Chairperson of the Supervisory Board of Public Service Pension<br />
Fund: WU Rong-ming (Wu Rongming)<br />
Control Branch (Yuan)<br />
President: Fredrick Fu CHIEN (Qian Fu)<br />
Vice-President: CHEN Meng-ling (Chen Mengling)<br />
Secretary-General: TU Shan-liang (Du Shanliang)<br />
National Audit Office<br />
Auditor-General: SU Chen-ping (Su Zhenping)<br />
Straits Exchange Foundation<br />
Chairperson: CHANG Chun-hsiung (Zhang Junxiong)<br />
Cross-Strait Common Market Foundation<br />
Chairperson: Vincent SIEW (Xiao Wanzhang)<br />
Military<br />
Chief of the General Staff: Gen HOU Shou-yeh (Huo Shouye)<br />
Dep.Chiefs: Gen CHU Kai-sheng (Zhu Kaisheng), Adm WANG<br />
Li-shen (Wang Lishen), Gen WU Ta-peng (Wu Dapeng)<br />
Director of the General Political Warfare Department:<br />
WU Ta-peng<br />
Commander-in-Chief, Army: Gen CHAO Shih-chang (Zhao<br />
Shizhang)<br />
Commander-in-Chief, Navy: Adm LIN Chen-yi (Lin Zhenyi)<br />
Commander-in-Chief, Air Force: Gen SHEN Kuo-chen (Shen<br />
Guozhen)<br />
Commander-in-Chief, Combined Logistics Command:<br />
Lt Gen CHIN Nai-chieh (Jin Naijie)<br />
Commander-in-Chief, Armed Forces Reserve Command: Gen YU<br />
Lien-fa (Yu Lianfa)<br />
Commander of the Military Police Command: Gen LU Tai-sheng<br />
(Lu Taisheng)<br />
President of the National Defense University: Gen TSENG<br />
Chin-ling (Zeng Jinling)<br />
Fujian Provincial Government<br />
Governor: YEN Chung-cheng (Yan Zhongcheng)<br />
Taipei City Government<br />
Mayor: HAU Lung-bin (Hao Longbin)<br />
Vice-Mayor: Samuel Shiouh-guang WU (Wu Xiuguang)<br />
Kaohsiung City Government<br />
Mayor: CHEN Chu (Chen Ju) (f)<br />
Political Parties<br />
Pan-green coalition<br />
Democratic Progressive Party (DPP)<br />
Chairperson: YU Shyi-kun (You Xikun)<br />
Secretary-General: LIN Chia-lung (Lin Jialong)<br />
Taiwan Solidarity Union<br />
Chairperson: Huang Kun-hui (Huang Kunhui)<br />
Secretary-General: LIN Chih-chia (Lin Zhijia)<br />
Pan-blue coalition<br />
Kuomintang (KMT)<br />
Hon.Chm.: LIAN Chan (Lian Zhan)<br />
Chairperson: MA Ying-jeou (Ma Yingjiu) (resigned on 13 Feb 07)<br />
V.-Chp.: CHANG Jen-hsiang (Zhang Renxiang), CHIANG Pin-kung<br />
(Jiang Bingkun), John KUAN (Guan Zhong), LIN Yi-shih (Lin Yishi),<br />
WU Poh-hsiung (Wu Boxiong)<br />
Secretary-General: WU Den-yih (Wu Dunyi)<br />
People First Party<br />
Chairperson: James SOONG Chu-yu (Song Chuyu)<br />
V.-Chp.: CHANG Chau-hsiung (Zhang Zhaoxiong)<br />
Secretary-General: CHIN Chin-sheng (Qin Jinsheng)<br />
New Party (NP)<br />
Chairperson: YOK Mu-ming (Yu Muming)<br />
Secretary-General: WANG Chien-shien (Wang Jianxuan)<br />
Not part of any coalition<br />
Non-Partisan Solidarity Union<br />
Chairperson: CHANG Po-ya (Zhang Boya) (f)