CV Ian Andersen - Jackson School of International Studies
CV Ian Andersen - Jackson School of International Studies CV Ian Andersen - Jackson School of International Studies
Curriculum Vitae Name Ian Bo Andersen Place and date of birth Copenhagen, 15 June 1956. Nationality: Danish Children Diego (20), reading physics at Imperial College, London Prisca (16), in European School Brussels I __________________________________________________________________________ Professional experience European Commission Directorate General for Interpretation (SCIC) 01/02/2004 to date Head of Unit, SCIC 02 Communication and Information (A*12) - 1 - EUI #10 Participate actively in formulating the internal and external communication strategy for the Commission. Communication consultant for DG Interpretation. Manager of Web-team, Speech-writer for the Director General. Editor and main writer of internal newsletter (112 issues to date), and intra- and internet sites. Manage construction and maintenance of websites and production of SCIC paper publications. Established constructive relations with press in and outside Brussels. 1/12/2000 - 31/01/2004 Directly attached to the Head of Service as Coordinator of Information/Web/Media for SCIC. Same tasks as above. Cited as example of best practice in Commission internal communication. Core contributor to Commission-wide benchmark for internal communication function. 1/10/1999 - 30/11/2000 Responsible for defining and establishing “SCIC Media Desk”, in charge of for contacts with press in Brussels and media relations on matters concerning interpretation (40 %). Concurrently working as an interpreter in the Danish and English Language Units. (60%) 1/7/1996 - 30/9/1999 Principal Interpreter, Danish Interpretation Unit. 1/7/1993 - 30/6/1996 Attached to SCIC Directorate A. Responsible for interpreter training and relations with training establishments in Asia; organised training for interpreters in Brussels, Geneva, Florence and Stockholm; represented SCIC at conferences on multilingualism and in Inter-service Groups on information policy, the
- Page 2 and 3: information society, and Japan; spe
- Page 4: Affiliations Member of the Internat
Curriculum Vitae<br />
Name <strong>Ian</strong> Bo <strong>Andersen</strong><br />
Place and date <strong>of</strong> birth Copenhagen, 15 June 1956. Nationality: Danish<br />
Children Diego (20), reading physics at Imperial College, London<br />
Prisca (16), in European <strong>School</strong> Brussels I<br />
__________________________________________________________________________<br />
Pr<strong>of</strong>essional experience<br />
European Commission Directorate General for Interpretation (SCIC)<br />
01/02/2004 to date Head <strong>of</strong> Unit, SCIC 02 Communication and Information (A*12)<br />
- 1 -<br />
EUI #10<br />
Participate actively in formulating the internal and external communication<br />
strategy for the Commission. Communication consultant for DG Interpretation.<br />
Manager <strong>of</strong> Web-team, Speech-writer for the Director General. Editor and main<br />
writer <strong>of</strong> internal newsletter (112 issues to date), and intra- and internet sites.<br />
Manage construction and maintenance <strong>of</strong> websites and production <strong>of</strong> SCIC paper<br />
publications. Established constructive relations with press in and outside<br />
Brussels.<br />
1/12/2000 - 31/01/2004 Directly attached to the Head <strong>of</strong> Service as Coordinator <strong>of</strong><br />
Information/Web/Media for SCIC.<br />
Same tasks as above. Cited as example <strong>of</strong> best practice in Commission internal<br />
communication. Core contributor to Commission-wide benchmark for internal<br />
communication function.<br />
1/10/1999 - 30/11/2000 Responsible for defining and establishing “SCIC Media Desk”, in charge <strong>of</strong><br />
for contacts with press in Brussels and media relations on matters concerning<br />
interpretation (40 %). Concurrently working as an interpreter in the Danish and<br />
English Language Units. (60%)<br />
1/7/1996 - 30/9/1999 Principal Interpreter, Danish Interpretation Unit.<br />
1/7/1993 - 30/6/1996 Attached to SCIC Directorate A. Responsible for interpreter training and<br />
relations with training establishments in Asia; organised training for interpreters<br />
in Brussels, Geneva, Florence and Stockholm; represented SCIC at conferences<br />
on multilingualism and in Inter-service Groups on information policy, the
information society, and Japan; speech-writing for the acting Director General.<br />
Directorate-A IT-correspondent<br />
Rapporteur for the Inter-institutional Reflection Group on Information<br />
Technology in Conference Interpreting. Participated actively in SCIC recruitment<br />
and communication work. Authored SCIC contribution to DG XIII programme<br />
on Multilingualism in the Information Society; gave radio interviews on SCIC<br />
and the pr<strong>of</strong>ession; participated in Forward <strong>Studies</strong> Unit seminar on Asian<br />
Perspectives in Hainan, China.<br />
1/1 - 30/6 /1993 SCIC Presidency co-ordinator for the Danish Presidency <strong>of</strong> the Council,<br />
reporting directly to the Director General, responsible for coordination <strong>of</strong><br />
interpretation for all EU meetings in Denmark during the six months.<br />
1/5/1986 to 14/10/2003 Assistant Interpreter, then Interpreter, later Principal Interpreter, SCIC.<br />
Working languages: from EN, FR, IT, NO, SV into Danish and from DA, FR,<br />
IT, NO, SV into English.<br />
From the outset, engaged in training and evaluation <strong>of</strong> <strong>of</strong> interpreters, including<br />
negotiation <strong>of</strong> interpreter training cooperation agreements with China, Vietnam,<br />
Macau and Thailand.<br />
Jury duty on candidate interpreter and trainee test-panels since 1987 in Brussels<br />
and in Member States; chaired annual selection <strong>of</strong> Chinese trainees in Beijing<br />
1991-1996; chaired selection <strong>of</strong> Vietnamese candidate trainees in Hanoi 1992,<br />
1993, 2002, and participated in Jury 2003; Lectured at various Chinese<br />
universities 1993-96, and at the Institute <strong>of</strong> <strong>International</strong> Relations, Hanoi, 1993.<br />
External Activities while at the European Commission<br />
1994 - Universities <strong>of</strong> Copenhagen and Aarhus, Denmark<br />
Government-appointed external examiner in Chinese studies. Elected Vice-<br />
President <strong>of</strong> (Danish) National College <strong>of</strong> external examiners, Chinese <strong>Studies</strong>,<br />
1994 and subsequently.<br />
1989-94, 2005- Copenhagen Business <strong>School</strong>, Denmark<br />
Government-appointed external examiner in conference interpreting at the Faculty<br />
<strong>of</strong> Modern Languages, Copenhagen Business <strong>School</strong>. From 2005 external<br />
examiner in Chinese.<br />
1982-1986 China Consult, Copenhagen<br />
Founder and manager <strong>of</strong> private business consultancy China Consult, advising<br />
and assisting clients in commercial and political contacts with the Peoples'<br />
Republic <strong>of</strong> China. Consultant for Danish television news.<br />
1984-85 Dansk Røde Kors, Copenhagen<br />
Executive editor <strong>of</strong> Danish Red Cross conflict yearbook Konflikternes Verden<br />
1984 and 1985.<br />
1982-1984 Dansk Udenrigspolitisk Institut, Copenhagen<br />
- 2 -
Executive editor for The Danish Institute <strong>of</strong> Foreign Policy <strong>of</strong> Dansk<br />
Udenrigspolitisk Årbog (Danish Foreign Policy Yearbook) 1982, 1983, 1984.<br />
1981-1984 University <strong>of</strong> Copenhagen – East Asia Institute<br />
Institute Librarian.<br />
____________________________<br />
Grants<br />
1984-85 Research fellowship from “The Carlsberg Foundation”.<br />
1978-79 Danish State travel grant to China<br />
1977-84 On scholarship from “Peter og Emma Thomsens Legat”.<br />
Education<br />
1985-86 Copenhagen Business <strong>School</strong>, Denmark<br />
Post-graduate degree in conference interpretation.<br />
1/1985 University <strong>of</strong> Copenhagen, Cand. mag.-degree in Chinese studies and political<br />
science.<br />
Masters thesis (in English): ”Aspects <strong>of</strong> Chinese Social Policy 1978-84: The<br />
Rural Areas”.<br />
1980-82 Political <strong>Studies</strong> included major paper on Danish Security Policy and European<br />
Political Co-operation (in Danish).<br />
1979 Nanjing University, China, History Department.<br />
1978 Peking Language Institute, China, General Language Department<br />
9/1976 Entered University <strong>of</strong> Copenhagen, East Asia Department<br />
1973-76 Aurehøj Statsgymnasium, Gent<strong>of</strong>te, Denmark<br />
1972-73 University High <strong>School</strong>, Norman, Oklahoma (junior year)<br />
1963-72 Bernadotteskolen, The <strong>International</strong> <strong>School</strong> in Denmark<br />
________________________________________________________<br />
Further Training<br />
European Commission training (most recent years only):<br />
2005 Basic financial management for authorising <strong>of</strong>ficers<br />
2004 Leadership – Henley Management College<br />
Middle Management - MTP<br />
2003 Internal Communication strategy<br />
External Communication strategy<br />
Focus group management<br />
Change management<br />
Recruitment <strong>of</strong> high performance staff<br />
- 3 -
Affiliations<br />
Member <strong>of</strong> the <strong>International</strong> Association <strong>of</strong> Business Communicators<br />
Member <strong>of</strong> the National Press Club <strong>of</strong> Denmark<br />
Member <strong>of</strong> executive committee <strong>of</strong> Brussels section <strong>of</strong> Danish political party<br />
- 4 -