ILLINOIS - The University of Illinois Board of Trustees
ILLINOIS - The University of Illinois Board of Trustees ILLINOIS - The University of Illinois Board of Trustees
602 BOARD OF TRUSTEES [May 15 The nomination is made with the advice of a consultative committee’ and is supported by the Executive Committee of the college. The vice president for aca- demic affairs concurs. I recommend approval. On motion of Mr. Lenz, this appointment was approved. By consensus the board agreed that one vote would be taken and considered the vote on each of the next ten items. The recommendations were individually discussed but acted upon at one time. Dean, College of liberal Arts and Sciences, Urbana (4) The chancellor at Urbana-Champaign has recommended the appointment of Dr. William F. Prokasy, presently professor of psychology and acting dean of the Graduate School of Social Work at the University of Utah, as professor of psy- chology on indefinite tenure and dean of the College of Liberal Arts and Sciences, beginning August 21, 1980 on a twelve-month service basis at an annual salary of $65,000. Dr. Prokasy will succeed Dr. Lloyd G. Humphreys who has been acting dean since Dr. Robert W. Rogers asked to be relieved of this administrative assignment effective August 21, 1979. The nomination is made with the advice of a search committee’ and is sup- ported by the Executive Committee of the college. The vice president for academic affairs concurs. I recommend approval. Head, Department of Energy Engineering, Chicago Circle (5) The dean of the College of Engineering has recommended to the chancellor at Chicago Circle the appointment of Rafli M. Turian, presently chairperson of the Department of Chemical Engineering, Texas Tech University, Lubbock, Texas, as professor of energy engineering, on indefinite tenure, and head of the Department of Energy Engineering, beginning September 1, 1980, on an academic year service basis, at an annual salary of $42,000. Dr. Turian will succeed Dr. Paul M. Chung who resigned from the headship June 1, 1979, to become dean of the College of Engineering. Professor Harold Simon has served as acting head. The nomination of Dr. Turian is supported by a search committee,’ the faculty of the Department of Energy Engineering, and the Executive Committee of the college. The chancellor has approved the recommendation, and the vice president for academic &airs concurs. I recommend approval. Kenneth P. Uhl, professor of business administration and head of the department, chairman; Mary L. Fellows m a t e professor of law. Wayne R. LaFave professor of law. Jonathan M. Landers profess; of law. John E. Nvwak irofessor of law; Me& Rothbaum prAfessor of labor and indktrial relations ahd director of thh Institute of Labor and Industrial Relations; James J. Stamos law student. ’ deorse W. Swenson, Jr,, professor of electrical engineering and head of the department and research professor of astronomy chair erson‘ Peter Beak, professor of chemistry. Arthur Getis fessor of geography and head df the tepartment; Timothy W. Heath, undergrahuate student.’gg Huber, professor of sociology and head of the department; Samuel Kaplan, professor of herb biology; Keneth Kinnamon, professor of English and head of the department; Susan L. Kline, graduate student; Joseph E. McGrath, professor of psychology; Louis R. Pondy, professor of business administration. *Richard M. Michaels, professor of urban systems and director of the Urban Systems Laboratory, rhoirman; Joseph C. Chow, professor of fluid mechanics in eneqy engineering and in bioengkneering; G. @ M ~ r i professor , of energy engineering; Floyd G. Miller, associate professor of industrial engineering in systems engineering and actin bead of the department; W. J. Midowya, professor of beat transfer in energy engineering; 8tephen Szepe, associate professor in energy engineering; Thomas C. T. Ting, professor of apphed mechanics in materials engineering; and P. L. E. Uslenghi, professor of information engineering.
19801 UNIVERSITY OF ILLINOIS 603 Head, Department of Biological Chemistry, School of Basic Medical Sciences, Medical Center (6) The chancellor at the Medical Center has recommended the appointment of William E. M. Lands, presently professor of biological chemistry at the University of Michigan Medical School, as professor of biological chemistry on indefinite tenure and head of the department, beginning July 1, 1980, on a twelve-month service basis, at an annual salary of $55,000. Dr. Lands will succeed Dr. Alfred Nisonoff who resigned from the headship on March 1, 1975. Dr. Mariano Tao has been serving as acting head. This recommendation is made with the advice of a search committee' and after consultation with members of the departmental faculty. The vice president for aca- demic affairs concurs. I recommend approval. Head, Department of Psychology, Urbana (7) The acting dean of the College of Liberal Arts and Sciences has recommended to the chancellor at Urbana-Champaign the appointment of Emanuel Donchin, presently professor of psychology and of physiology and biophysics, as head of the Department of Psychology, beginning August 21, 1980, on an academic year service basis, at an annual salary of $45.350. Dr. Donchin will continue to hold the rank of professor of psychology and of physiology and biophysics on indefinite tenure. He will succeed Dr. Joseph David Birch who asked to be relieved of this administrative assignment. The nomination is made with the advice of a search committee' and after consultation with members of the departmental faculty. The Executive Committee of the college supports this appointment. The chancellor and the vice president for academic affairs have approved the recommendation. I recommend approval. Head, Department of Veterinary Pathobiology, Urbana (8) The dean of the College of Veterinary Medicine has recommended to the chancellor at Urbana-Champaign the appointment of Dr. John A. Shadduck, pres- ently professor of comparative pathology at Southwestern Medical School, Univer- sity of Texas at Dallas, as professor of veterinary pathobiology on indefinite tenure and head of the department, beginning August 4, 1980, on a tweIve-month service basis, at an annual salary of $56,000. Dr. Shadduck will succeed Dr. Lyle E. Hanson who became associate dean of the college April 1, 1979. Dr. Paul D. Beamer has been acting head. The nomination is made with the advice of a search committee' and after 'Harold Feinberg professor of pharmacology, SBMS-MC and in surgery ALSM chairmnn: Eric Falck-Peterson 'graduate student. John Hop r associate pmfessor oi mediciie, ALSM. Newton Khoobyariin professor and akng head &&tment of Microbiology and Immunology' SBMS-MC. Mahin Maines associate professor oi harmacology SBMS-MC; George D. Pappas' professor ind bead Deparbent of Anatomy SBdS-MC. Jam& C. Vary, professor of biological chemistry, SBMS-MC; and Lourens J. D. &neve!d, professor and actinGhead, Department of Physiology and Biophysics SBMS-MC and in obstetrics and gynecology ALS . f C. Ladd Prosser, piofasor eme;ituc of physioloy and biophysics: chnirman; Martin Firhbein E;pfessor of psychology and research proferror in the nstitute of Communications Research; Harold Hake, professor of psycholcgy: Rw D. Parke professor of psychology; Julian Rappaport, professor of psychology in charge of the Psychologkal Clinic; and Philip Teitelbaum, professor of psychology. a Diego Segre, Ffessor of veterinary research in the De artment of Veterinary Pathobiology and in Veterinary rogram in Agriculture chnirman; Leroy 8. Biehl, assistant professor of veterinary clinical medicine and veterinary padobiology, in Continuing Education and Public Service and Veterinary Pro rams in Agriculture- Raymond C. Cragle rfrrsor of dairy science, direct& of the Agricultural %xperiment Station, 'and associate dean or' t e College of Agriculture;. Everett H. Heath, associate professor of veterinary biosciences and in Veterinary. Programs in A~r~culture; Walter E. Hoffmann. mistant professor of veterinary clinical mediune and of pathobiology; Miodrag Ristic, professor of veterinary pthobiology, and in Veterinary Programs in Apriculturq; John C. Thurmon, professor of biosciences and veterinary clinical medune, and +id of Anestheuology Section in veterinary clinical mediae; Kenneth S. Todd, pmfmot of vetennary parasitology in veterinary pathobiology.
- Page 563 and 564: MEETING OF THE BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF
- Page 565 and 566: 19801 UNIVERSITY OF ILLINOIS 553 ju
- Page 567 and 568: 19801 UNIVERSITY OF ILLINOIS 555 Bu
- Page 569 and 570: 19801 UNIVERSITY OF ILLINOIS 557 Th
- Page 571 and 572: 19801 UNIVERSITY OF ILLINOIS 559 Il
- Page 573 and 574: 19803 UNIVERSITY OF ILLINOIS 561 Sa
- Page 575 and 576: 19801 UNIVERSITY OF ILLINOIS 563 as
- Page 577 and 578: 19801 UNIVERSITY OF ILLINOIS 565 (e
- Page 579 and 580: 19801 UNIVERSITY OF ILUNOIS 567 Div
- Page 581 and 582: 19801 UNIVERSITY OF ILLINOIS 569 Gr
- Page 583 and 584: 19801 UNIVERSITY OF ILLINOIS 571 Wi
- Page 585 and 586: 19801 UNIVERSITY OF ILLINOIS 573 Su
- Page 587 and 588: 19801 UNIVERSITY OF ILLINOIS 575 ti
- Page 589 and 590: MEETING OF THE BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF
- Page 591 and 592: 19801 UNIVERSITY OF ILLINOIS 579 re
- Page 593 and 594: 198q UNIVERSITY OF ILLINOIS 581 N-T
- Page 595 and 596: 19801 UNIVERSITY OF ILLINOIS 583 St
- Page 597 and 598: 19801 UNIVERSITY OF ILLINOIS 585 Th
- Page 599 and 600: 19801 UNIVERSITY OF ILLINOIS 587 19
- Page 601 and 602: 19801 UNIVERSITY OF ILLINOIS 589 Am
- Page 603 and 604: 198OJ UNIVERSITY OF ILLINOIS 59 1 D
- Page 605 and 606: 19801 UNIVERSITY OF ILLINOIS With W
- Page 607 and 608: 19801 UNIVERSITY OF ILLINOIS 595 Wh
- Page 609 and 610: MEETING OF THE BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF
- Page 611 and 612: 19801 UNIVERSITY OF ILLINOIS 5% MIN
- Page 613: 19801 UNIVERSITY OF ILLINOIS 60 1 a
- Page 617 and 618: 19801 UNIVERSITY OF ILLINOIS 605 Ur
- Page 619 and 620: 19801 UNIVERSITY OF ILLINOIS 607 Ma
- Page 621 and 622: 19801 UNIVERSIlY OF ILLINOIS 609 li
- Page 623 and 624: 19801 UNIVERSITY OF ILLINOIS 61 1 T
- Page 625 and 626: 19801 UNIVERSITY OF ILLINOIS 613 Fe
- Page 627 and 628: 19801 UNIVERSITY OF ILLINOIS 615 19
- Page 629 and 630: 19801 UNIVERSITY OF ILIJNOIS 617 Pa
- Page 631 and 632: 19801 UNIVERSITY OF ILLINOIS 619 de
- Page 633 and 634: 19801 UNIVERSITY OF ILLINOIS 62 1 t
- Page 635 and 636: 19801 With Whom 8083-13 State of Il
- Page 637 and 638: 19801 UNIVERSITY OF ILLINOIS 625 S-
- Page 639 and 640: MEETING OF THE BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF
- Page 641 and 642: 19801 UNIVERSITY OF ILLINOIS 629 th
- Page 643 and 644: 19801 UNIVERSITY OF ILLINOIS 63 1 w
- Page 645 and 646: 19801 UNIVERSITY OF ILLINOIS 633 Ch
- Page 647 and 648: 19801 UNIVERSITY OF ILLINOIS 635 19
- Page 649 and 650: 19801 UNIVERSITY OF ILLINOIS 63 7 T
- Page 651 and 652: 19801 UNIVERSITY OF ILLINOIS 639 th
- Page 653 and 654: 19801 UNIVERSITY OF ILLINOIS fj41 9
- Page 655 and 656: 19801 UNIVERSITY OF ILLINOIS 643 Th
- Page 657 and 658: 19801 UNIVERSITY OF ILLINOIS 645 Po
- Page 659 and 660: 19801 UNIVERSITY OF ILLINOIS 647 d.
- Page 661 and 662: 19801 UNIVERSITY OF ILLINOIS 649 Oi
- Page 663 and 664: 19801 UNIVERSITY OF ILLINOIS 65 1 C
602 BOARD OF TRUSTEES [May 15<br />
<strong>The</strong> nomination is made with the advice <strong>of</strong> a consultative committee’ and is<br />
supported by the Executive Committee <strong>of</strong> the college. <strong>The</strong> vice president for aca-<br />
demic affairs concurs.<br />
I recommend approval.<br />
On motion <strong>of</strong> Mr. Lenz, this appointment was approved.<br />
By consensus the board agreed that one vote would be taken and considered<br />
the vote on each <strong>of</strong> the next ten items. <strong>The</strong> recommendations were individually<br />
discussed but acted upon at one time.<br />
Dean, College <strong>of</strong> liberal Arts and Sciences, Urbana<br />
(4) <strong>The</strong> chancellor at Urbana-Champaign has recommended the appointment <strong>of</strong><br />
Dr. William F. Prokasy, presently pr<strong>of</strong>essor <strong>of</strong> psychology and acting dean <strong>of</strong> the<br />
Graduate School <strong>of</strong> Social Work at the <strong>University</strong> <strong>of</strong> Utah, as pr<strong>of</strong>essor <strong>of</strong> psy-<br />
chology on indefinite tenure and dean <strong>of</strong> the College <strong>of</strong> Liberal Arts and Sciences,<br />
beginning August 21, 1980 on a twelve-month service basis at an annual salary <strong>of</strong><br />
$65,000.<br />
Dr. Prokasy will succeed Dr. Lloyd G. Humphreys who has been acting dean<br />
since Dr. Robert W. Rogers asked to be relieved <strong>of</strong> this administrative assignment<br />
effective August 21, 1979.<br />
<strong>The</strong> nomination is made with the advice <strong>of</strong> a search committee’ and is sup-<br />
ported by the Executive Committee <strong>of</strong> the college. <strong>The</strong> vice president for academic<br />
affairs concurs.<br />
I recommend approval.<br />
Head, Department <strong>of</strong> Energy Engineering, Chicago Circle<br />
(5) <strong>The</strong> dean <strong>of</strong> the College <strong>of</strong> Engineering has recommended to the chancellor<br />
at Chicago Circle the appointment <strong>of</strong> Rafli M. Turian, presently chairperson <strong>of</strong> the<br />
Department <strong>of</strong> Chemical Engineering, Texas Tech <strong>University</strong>, Lubbock, Texas, as<br />
pr<strong>of</strong>essor <strong>of</strong> energy engineering, on indefinite tenure, and head <strong>of</strong> the Department<br />
<strong>of</strong> Energy Engineering, beginning September 1, 1980, on an academic year service<br />
basis, at an annual salary <strong>of</strong> $42,000.<br />
Dr. Turian will succeed Dr. Paul M. Chung who resigned from the headship<br />
June 1, 1979, to become dean <strong>of</strong> the College <strong>of</strong> Engineering. Pr<strong>of</strong>essor Harold<br />
Simon has served as acting head.<br />
<strong>The</strong> nomination <strong>of</strong> Dr. Turian is supported by a search committee,’ the faculty<br />
<strong>of</strong> the Department <strong>of</strong> Energy Engineering, and the Executive Committee <strong>of</strong> the<br />
college. <strong>The</strong> chancellor has approved the recommendation, and the vice president<br />
for academic &airs concurs.<br />
I recommend approval.<br />
Kenneth P. Uhl, pr<strong>of</strong>essor <strong>of</strong> business administration and head <strong>of</strong> the department, chairman;<br />
Mary L. Fellows m a t e pr<strong>of</strong>essor <strong>of</strong> law. Wayne R. LaFave pr<strong>of</strong>essor <strong>of</strong> law. Jonathan M.<br />
Landers pr<strong>of</strong>ess; <strong>of</strong> law. John E. Nvwak ir<strong>of</strong>essor <strong>of</strong> law; Me& Rothbaum prAfessor <strong>of</strong> labor<br />
and indktrial relations ahd director <strong>of</strong> thh Institute <strong>of</strong> Labor and Industrial Relations; James J.<br />
Stamos law student.<br />
’ deorse W. Swenson, Jr,, pr<strong>of</strong>essor <strong>of</strong> electrical engineering and head <strong>of</strong> the department and<br />
research pr<strong>of</strong>essor <strong>of</strong> astronomy chair erson‘ Peter Beak, pr<strong>of</strong>essor <strong>of</strong> chemistry. Arthur Getis<br />
fessor <strong>of</strong> geography and head df the tepartment; Timothy W. Heath, undergrahuate student.’gg<br />
Huber, pr<strong>of</strong>essor <strong>of</strong> sociology and head <strong>of</strong> the department; Samuel Kaplan, pr<strong>of</strong>essor <strong>of</strong> herb<br />
biology; Keneth Kinnamon, pr<strong>of</strong>essor <strong>of</strong> English and head <strong>of</strong> the department; Susan L. Kline,<br />
graduate student; Joseph E. McGrath, pr<strong>of</strong>essor <strong>of</strong> psychology; Louis R. Pondy, pr<strong>of</strong>essor <strong>of</strong><br />
business administration.<br />
*Richard M. Michaels, pr<strong>of</strong>essor <strong>of</strong> urban systems and director <strong>of</strong> the Urban Systems Laboratory,<br />
rhoirman; Joseph C. Chow, pr<strong>of</strong>essor <strong>of</strong> fluid mechanics in eneqy engineering and in bioengkneering;<br />
G. @ M ~ r i pr<strong>of</strong>essor , <strong>of</strong> energy engineering; Floyd G. Miller, associate pr<strong>of</strong>essor<br />
<strong>of</strong> industrial engineering in systems engineering and actin bead <strong>of</strong> the department; W. J.<br />
Midowya, pr<strong>of</strong>essor <strong>of</strong> beat transfer in energy engineering; 8tephen Szepe, associate pr<strong>of</strong>essor in<br />
energy engineering; Thomas C. T. Ting, pr<strong>of</strong>essor <strong>of</strong> apphed mechanics in materials engineering;<br />
and P. L. E. Uslenghi, pr<strong>of</strong>essor <strong>of</strong> information engineering.